This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 08:44:13 (UTC).

Clark et al v. City of St. Louis, Missouri et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Clark filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of St Louis, Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00788

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ashley Boureima Mourou

Sherrie Clark-Torrence

A.C.

Don R. Clark, Jr.

Adonis H. Clark

Defendants

Brandon Moore

Mark Seper

Michael Flatley

Nicholas Manasco

Jon Long

Bennie Blackmon

James Zwilling

Joseph Busso

City of St. Louis, Missouri

Daniel Cora

Mathew Tesreau

Thomas Strode

Ronald Allen

Ronald A. Mueller

John Jones

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emanuel Powell, III

Attorney at ARCHCITY DEFENDERS

440 N. 4Th St., Suite 390

St. Louis, MO 63102

Jacki J. Langum

Attorney at ARCHCITY DEFENDERS

440 N. 4Th St., Suite 390

St. Louis, MO 63102

Jerryl T. Christmas

Attorney at CHRISTMAS AND ASSOCIATES

6101 Delmar Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63112-1203

Blake Alexander Strode

Attorney at ARCHCITY DEFENDERS

440 N. 4Th St., Suite 390

St. Louis, MO 63102

John McCann Waldron

Attorney at ARCHCITY DEFENDERS

440 N. 4Th St., Suite 390

St. Louis, MO 63102

Maureen Hanlon

Attorney at ARCHCITY DEFENDERS

440 N. 4Th St., Suite 390

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #3

Waiver of Service

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Jerryl T. Christmas for Plaintiff Ashley Boureima Mourou. (Christmas, Jerryl) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Jerryl T. Christmas for Plaintiff Sherrie Clark-Torrence. (Christmas, Jerryl) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Jerryl T. Christmas for Plaintiff Don R. Clark, Jr. (Christmas, Jerryl) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Jerryl T. Christmas for Plaintiff Adonis H. Clark. (Christmas, Jerryl) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Jerryl T. Christmas for Plaintiff Ashley Boureima Mourou. (Christmas, Jerryl) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Jerryl T. Christmas for Plaintiff A.C.. (Christmas, Jerryl) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Jacki J. Langum for Plaintiffs A.C., Ashley Boureima Mourou, Adonis H. Clark, Don R. Clark, Jr, Sherrie Clark-Torrence. (Langum, Jacki) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Blake Alexander Strode for Plaintiffs A.C., Ashley Boureima Mourou, Adonis H. Clark, Don R. Clark, Jr, Sherrie Clark-Torrence. (Strode, Blake) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Maureen Hanlon for Plaintiffs A.C., Ashley Boureima Mourou, Adonis H. Clark, Don R. Clark, Jr, Sherrie Clark-Torrence. (Hanlon, Maureen) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #2 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to A.C. ; relationship to minor:Mother by Plaintiff A.C. a minor, by and through her mother and next friend, NECOLE FISHER. (Powell, Emanuel) filed by A.C. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/30/21. (ARL) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by John McCann Waldron for Plaintiffs A.C., Ashley Boureima Mourou, Adonis H. Clark, Don R. Clark, Jr, Sherrie Clark-Torrence. (Waldron, John) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Waivers issued 22. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JKL) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to A.C. ; relationship to minor:Mother by Plaintiff A.C. a minor, by and through her mother and next friend, NECOLE FISHER. (Powell, Emanuel) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8731632, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Ashley Boureima Mourou, Don R. Clark, Jr, Sherrie Clark-Torrence, A.C. a minor, by and through her mother and next friend, NECOLE FISHER, Adonis H. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service)(Powell, Emanuel) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerryl T. Christmas(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maureen Hanlon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacki J. Langum(Designation Retained)