This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2022 at 07:47:22 (UTC).

Clark et al v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 Clark filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00105

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judge

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jessica Ann-Marie Clark

Robert Nicholas Clark, II

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

BP America Production Company

Transocean Deepwater, Inc.

Transocean Holdings LLC

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Riana Maryanoff

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Charles David Durkee

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Riana *Maryanoff-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Charles David Durkee - PHV

Attorney at THE DOWNS LAW GROUP, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Terris C. Harris

Attorney at THE COCHRAN FIRM - Ridgeland

198 Charmant Place, Suite 2

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Defendant Attorneys

Kerry James Miller

Attorney at Fishman Haygood, LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, 46Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

Alysson Leigh Mills

Attorney at MILLS & AMOND, LLP

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1525

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daniel John Dysart

Attorney at Fishman Haygood, LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 4600, 46Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170-4600

Paul C. Thibodeaux

Attorney at Fishman Haygood, LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 4600, 46Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170-4600

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Second Request Letter sent to Dysart, Miller and Thibodeaux on 6/22/22 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Alysson Leigh Mills on behalf of Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Mills, Alysson) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on May 10, 2022 (SK) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

16 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Terris C. Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#14

(#14) Letter sent to Durkee, Maryanoff, Dysart. Miller and Thibodeaux on 4/26/22 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

13 #1

*Restricted*

13 #13

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#12

(#12) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/25/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#11

(#11) Statement by All Plaintiffs Amended PTO 66 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#10

(#10) Statement by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II Amended PTO 66 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER that, no later than 2/4/2022, Plaintiffs Jessica Ann-Marie Clark and Robert Nicholas Clark II, on behalf of their minor child G.C., must provide full and complete initial disclosures, including a response to the damages question in PTO 66. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear before Judge Barbier to show cause why the claims of G.C. cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/4/2022. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#8

(#8) Statement by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II PTO 66 (Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#7

(#7) Statement by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II PTO 63 (Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 12/20/2021)

6 #5

Summons Executed Waiver of Summons

6 #4

Summons Executed Waiver of Summons

6 #1

Summons Executed Waiver of Summons

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Second Request Letter sent to Dysart, Miller and Thibodeaux on 6/22/22 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Alysson Leigh Mills on behalf of Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Mills, Alysson) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on May 10, 2022 (SK) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Charles David Durkee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4832576) by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Harris, Terris) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Terris C. Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter sent to Durkee, Maryanoff, Dysart. Miller and Thibodeaux on 4/26/22 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01732. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 4/25/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Statement by All Plaintiffs Amended PTO 66 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II Amended PTO 66 (Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that, no later than 2/4/2022, Plaintiffs Jessica Ann-Marie Clark and Robert Nicholas Clark II, on behalf of their minor child G.C., must provide full and complete initial disclosures, including a response to the damages question in PTO 66. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear before Judge Barbier to show cause why the claims of G.C. cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 1/4/2022. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II PTO 66 (Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II PTO 63 (Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP America Production Company on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; BP Exploration & Production, Inc. on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Transocean Deepwater, Inc. on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Transocean Holdings, LLC on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Waiver of Summons, #2 Summons Executed Waiver of Summons, #3 Summons Executed Waiver of Summons, #4 Summons Executed Waiver of Summons, #5 Summons Executed Waiver of Summons)(Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR THE B3 BUNDLE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/23/2021.(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Regarding Filing Requests for Summons and Summons Returns; ORDERED that requests for summons shall be filed in the docket for the member case, as opposed to the master docket. FURTHER ORDERED that summons returns shall not be filed into any docket, master or member, unless filing the summons return becomes necessary (for example, in connection with a motion for default judgment). When it is necessary to file a summons return, the attorney shall avoid filing the summons return as a separate, stand-alone document in the master docket. Instead, the summons return shall be filed as an exhibit to the motion, etc., to which it relates. (Doc #10204 in 10-md-2179). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 05/20/2013.(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRETRIAL ORDERS #1, #11, #12 1st Amended, #25, #31, #41 2nd Amended, #68, #68 1st Amended. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 PTO #11, #2 PTO #12 1st Amended, #3 PTO #25, #4 PTO #31, #5 PTO #41 2nd Amended, #6 PTO #68, #7 PTO #68 1st Amended)(gec) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9034582) filed by Jessica Ann-Marie Clark, Robert Nicholas Clark, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Riana Maryanoff added to party G.C. a Minor Child(pty:pla).(Maryanoff, Riana) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant