This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2023 at 08:01:59 (UTC).

Clark et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Clark filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Anderson, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00692

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly Payne Clark

Shannon Payne Lancaster

Defendants

3M Company

Beaty Investments Inc

Fluor Constructors International

ITT LLC

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

4520 Corp Inc

ABB Inc

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Anchor/Darling Valve Company

Armstrong International Inc

Avon Products Inc

Bahnson Inc

Barretts Minerals Inc

Beacon CMP Corporation

Guy M Beaty & Co

Bechtel Corporation

Belk Inc

Brenntag North America Inc

78 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Daniel Kassel

Theile Branham McVey

Other Attorneys

A Victor Rawl, Jr

William Henry Kleindienst

Alice W Parham Casey

Rachael Lewis Anna

William Marvin Wilson, III

Allyson Rebecca Twilley

Nicolas John Cherry

Stephanie G Flynn

Wallace K Lightsey

 

Court Documents

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

(#17) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Text Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Clerk of Court Richland County Court of Common Pleas PO Box 2766 Columbia, SC 29202-2766 (mflo, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

16 #1

Text Order Certified

16 #16

Main Document

#13

(#13) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Mary Kay Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wilson, William) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

12 #4

Exhibit Ex. 4 - 03.11.23 Payne Complaint

12 #3

Exhibit Ex. 3 - Pls MIL #9 Preclude Defendants

12 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2 - Rite Aid Memo In Support of MSJ

12 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 - Extract-MIL Hearing Transcript 2.15.23

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF JOINDER by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Whitaker Clark & Daniels Inc (Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

10 #6

Exhibit Ex. F E-mail of 2/19/2023 with proposed Order limiting Avon's exper

10 #4

Exhibit Ex. D Avon Products Trial Witness List

10 #3

Exhibit Ex. C E-mails relating to coordination of Litigation Services

10 #1

Exhibit Ex. A Pre-Trial Hearing Transcript

10 #10

Main Document

7 #1

Memo in Support Pls' Memo in Supp of Emergency Motion to Remand

7 #7

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motions held on February 22, 2023, at 4:30 p.m., before Judge Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Court Reporter: Carly Horenkamp, RDR, CRR, CRC. E-mail: carleen_horenkamp@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 3/17/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2023. (chorenkamp) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Text Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Clerk of Court Richland County Court of Common Pleas PO Box 2766 Columbia, SC 29202-2766 (mflo, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 15 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, to Clerk of Court for Richland County Court of Common Pleas (Attachments: #1 Text Order Certified) (mflo, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER Court grants after hearing oral arguments #7 Motion to Remand to State Court, Richland County Court of Common Pleas filed by Kelly Payne Clark, Shannon Payne Lancaster for reasons stated in open court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 2/22/23.(mflo, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2023; granting #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court 2022-CP-40-01281 filed by Shannon Payne Lancaster, Kelly Payne Clark. Court Reporter Carly Horenkamp. (mflo, ) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Mary Kay Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Wilson, William) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court 2022-CP-40-01281 Response filed by Mary Kay Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/1/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Extract-MIL Hearing Transcript 2.15.23, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Rite Aid Memo In Support of MSJ, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Pls MIL #9 Preclude Defendants, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 03.11.23 Payne Complaint)(Wilson, William) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF JOINDER by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Whitaker Clark & Daniels Inc (Cherry, Nicolas) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court 2022-CP-40-01281 Response filed by Whitaker Clark & Daniels Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/1/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Pre-Trial Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Declaration of Casey Christian, #3 Exhibit Ex. C E-mails relating to coordination of Litigation Services, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Avon Products Trial Witness List, #5 Exhibit Ex. E E-mail of 02/18/2023 with proposed Order Striking Attanoos, #6 Exhibit Ex. F E-mail of 2/19/2023 with proposed Order limiting Avon's experts, #7 Exhibit Ex. G E-mail serving page and line objections to remaining defendants)(Flynn, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Wallace K Lightsey on behalf of Mary Kay Inc (Lightsey, Wallace) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court 2022-CP-40-01281. First attachment description: Emergency Motion for Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Exhibit Deposition of Susan Lowell, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Jonathan Penny, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Vani Reed, #5 Exhibit Rite Aid Answers to Pls' Standard Interrogs and RTPs, #6 Exhibit Rite Aid Answers to Pls' Interrogs and RTPs, #7 Exhibit Deposition of Shannon Lancaster 09-06-2022, #8 Exhibit Deposition of Shannon Lancaster 09-08-2022, #9 Exhibit Deposition of Kelly Payne Clark 11-08-2022, #10 Exhibit Deposition of Kelly Payne Clark 11-09-2022, #11 Exhibit Pls' Response to Rite Aid MSJ, #12 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing 02-15-2023, #13 Exhibit Email from Attorney for Avon - did not consent)(Kassel, John) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court 2022-CP-40-01281 by Kelly Payne Clark, Shannon Payne Lancaster. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Pls' Memo in Supp of Emergency Motion to Remand)No proposed order.(Kassel, John) see #8 additional attachment (Main Document 7 and Attachment 1 replaced on 2/22/2023 with filing attorney signature) (mflo, ). (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing on the Motion to Remand that is anticipated to be filed set for 2/22/2023 04:00 PM in Columbia # 4, Matthew J. Perry Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Whitaker Clark & Daniels Inc.(mflo, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Color Techniques Inc.(mflo, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mary Kay Inc.(mflo, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-40-1281. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10952665), filed by Whitaker Clark & Daniels Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 State Court Documents state court pretrial hearing transcript)(mflo, ) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less