This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2021 at 09:50:54 (UTC).

Clark County, Nevada v. Orbitz Worldwide, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Clark County, Nevada filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Orbitz Worldwide, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01328

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clark County, Nevada

Defendants

Orbitz Worldwide, LLC

Orbitz, LLC

Orbitz, Inc.

Travelscape, LLC

Travelocity, Inc.

Cheap Tickets, Inc.

Expedia, Inc.

Expedia Global, LLC

Hotels.com, LP

Hotwire Inc.

Booking Holdings Inc.

Priceline.com, LLC

Travelweb, LLC

Travelnow.com, Inc.

Agoda International USA LLC

Hotel Tonight, LLC

Hotel Tonight, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alvin William Maupin

Attorney at Maupin

13345 Goldpan Dr

Reno, NV 89511

Bert Wuester, Jr.

Attorney at Clark Hill, PLLC

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Dominic P. Gentile

Attorney at Clark Hill

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Mark Dzarnoski

Attorney at Clark Hill

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Michael V Cristalli

Attorney at Clark Hill

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Defendant Attorneys

James J. Pisanelli

Attorney at Pisanelli Bice PLLC

400 South 7Th Street, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Jordan T. Smith

Attorney at Pisanelli Bice, PLLC

400 South 7Th Street, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Todd L. Bice

Attorney at Pisanelli Bice PLLC

400 South 7Th Street, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #6

Exhibit F

11 #5

Exhibit E

11 #4

Exhibit D

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

9 #6

Exhibit 6

9 #5

Exhibit 5

9 #4

Exhibit 4

9 #3

Exhibit 3

9 #2

Exhibit 2

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Clark County, Nevada. (Dzarnoski, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.com, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. Replies due by 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Bice, Todd) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Clark County, Nevada. (Dzarnoski, Mark) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Clark County, Nevada. Responses due by 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Dzarnoski, Mark) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re: #1 Petition for Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Response to Complaint by Defendants Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.com, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Priceline.com, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. (Bice, Todd) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent AIRBNB, Inc. for Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC added. (Bice, Todd) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Agoda International USA LLC, Booking Holdings Inc., Priceline.com, LLC, Travelweb, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bice, Todd) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cheap Tickets, Inc., Expedia Global, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Travelscape, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bice, Todd) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/14/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/29/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-834681-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6556744) by Expedia Global, LLC, Travelscape, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Agoda International USA LLC, Travelweb, LLC, Hotwire Inc., Travelocity, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Cheap Tickets, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Booking Holdings Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Priceline.com, LLC, Orbitz, Inc., Hotel Tonight, LLC, Expedia, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bice, Todd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOTEL TONIGHT INC. DBA HOTELTONIGHT.COM DBA HOTEL TONIGHT DBA HOTELTONIGHT is a litigant

Latest cases where Orbitz Worldwide, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hotwire, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelscape, LLC is a litigant