This case was last updated from PACER on 04/17/2021 at 10:42:03 (UTC).

Clarity Sports International LLC et al v. Silver

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Clarity Sports International LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Silver. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Walter E. Johnson and Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clarity Sports International LLC

Jason Bernstein

Defendant

Jake Silver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D. Comerford

Attorney at Dowd Bennet, LLP

Suite 1900, 7733 Forsyth Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63105

Joseph Matthew Maguire, Jr.

Attorney at Parks Chesin & Walbert, P.C. -Atl

Suite 2600, 75 Fourteenth Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

James B. Martin

Attorney at Dowd Bennett LLP

Suite 1900, 7733 Forsyth Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorney

Kevin Allen Maxim

Attorney at The Maxim Law Firm, P.C.

Suite 599, 1718 Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER - For the reasons set forth above, the Court GRANTS the Motion to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena #1 and DIRECTS Mr. Silver to produce the requested documents (and any necessary privilege log) on or before April 1, 2021, and to sit for his video deposition on Friday, April 16, 2021 per agreement of the parties. Additionally, the Court DIRECTS plaintiffs to comply with Rule 45's requirement to tender Mr. Silver's fee for one day's attendance and the allowable mileage. Other than the amendment reflected above, the March 2, 2021, Order remains unchanged and in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/23/21. (klb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION to Amend #9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Jake Silver. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maxim, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#10

(#10) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER - The Court GRANTS the Motion to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena #1 and DIRECTS Mr. Silver to sit for his video deposition and produce the requested documents (and any necessary privilege log) within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Order. Additionally, the Court DIRECTS plaintiffs to comply with Rule 45's requirement to tender Mr. Silver's fee for one day's attendance and the allowable mileage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/2/21. (klb) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit -8

1 #8

Exhibit -7

1 #7

Exhibit -6

1 #6

Exhibit -5

1 #5

Exhibit -4

1 #4

Exhibit -3

1 #3

Exhibit -2

1 #2

Exhibit -1

1 #1

Brief

#1

(#1) MOTION to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena with Brief In Support by Jason Bernstein and Clarity Sports International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -1, #3 Exhibit -2, #4 Exhibit -3, #5 Exhibit -4, #6 Exhibit -5, #7 Exhibit -6, #8 Exhibit -7, #9 Exhibit -8, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER - For the reasons set forth above, the Court GRANTS the Motion to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena #1 and DIRECTS Mr. Silver to produce the requested documents (and any necessary privilege log) on or before April 1, 2021, and to sit for his video deposition on Friday, April 16, 2021 per agreement of the parties. Additionally, the Court DIRECTS plaintiffs to comply with Rule 45's requirement to tender Mr. Silver's fee for one day's attendance and the allowable mileage. Other than the amendment reflected above, the March 2, 2021, Order remains unchanged and in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/23/21. (klb) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION to Amend #9 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Jake Silver. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maxim, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - The Court GRANTS the Motion to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena #1 and DIRECTS Mr. Silver to sit for his video deposition and produce the requested documents (and any necessary privilege log) within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Order. Additionally, the Court DIRECTS plaintiffs to comply with Rule 45's requirement to tender Mr. Silver's fee for one day's attendance and the allowable mileage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/2/21. (klb) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John D. Comerford; and granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Martin by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on February 19, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of James Martin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10726219).Attorney James B. Martin added appearing on behalf of Jason Bernstein, Clarity Sports International LLC (cdg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of John D. Comerford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10726162). Attorney John D. Comerford added appearing on behalf of Jason Bernstein, Clarity Sports International LLC (cdg) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 MOTION to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (bdb) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:21-mi-4-MHC. (bdb) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of James Martin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10726219).by Jason Bernstein, Clarity Sports International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Maguire, Joseph) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of John D. Comerford Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10726162).by Jason Bernstein, Clarity Sports International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Maguire, Joseph) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to John D. Comerford. Clerk to follow-up by 2/22/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James B. Martin. Clerk to follow-up by 2/22/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE re #1 MOTION enforce and Objections filed by Jake Silver. (Maxim, Kevin) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Jake Silver. All Plaintiffs. (Maxim, Kevin) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number AGANDC-10621211 (eop) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena with Brief In Support by Jason Bernstein and Clarity Sports International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -1, #3 Exhibit -2, #4 Exhibit -3, #5 Exhibit -4, #6 Exhibit -5, #7 Exhibit -6, #8 Exhibit -7, #9 Exhibit -8, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clarity Sports International LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin A. Maxim