Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2021 at 08:11:51 (UTC).

Clapp et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Clapp filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Ally Financial Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21441

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Defendants

Square Inc.

Freetrade, Ltd.

Trading 212 Ltd.

Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC

Robinhood Securities, LLC

Barclays Bank P.L.C.

E*Trade Securities LLC

Stash Financial, Inc.

Robinhood Financial LLC

Fumi Holdings, Inc.

Ally Financial Inc.

Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC

Cash App Investing LLC

TD Ameritrade, Inc.

Citadel Securities, LLC

APEX CLEARING CORPORATION

Dough LLC

Interactive Brokers, LLC

The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation

Melvin Capital Management, LP

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Eric D. Monek Anderson

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Carl Brandon Wisoff

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Heather Marie Burke

Attorney at White and Case LLP

3000 El Camino Real, 2 Palo Alto Square, Suite 900

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Brian Hauck

Attorney at Jenner and Block LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gregory M. Boyle

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Other Attorneys

Eric Lechtzin

Attorney at Edelson Lechtzin LLP

3 Terry Drive, Suite 205

Newtown, PA 18940

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Boyle, Gregory. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#70

(#42) SEVENTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#33

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Redfield, Sabrina Clapp. Service waived by Citadel Securities LLC waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER that Defendant Barclays Bank PLC is dismissed from this action without prejudice re (318 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/27/2021. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21441-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SEVENTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#41) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00896 with documents 1-38. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21441-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#40) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Case transferred in from California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00896. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MDL TRANSFER ORDER NO. 2989 AND CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1): Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami). Signed by The Judicial Panel onMultidistrict Litigation, on 04/13/21 (Attachments: #1 MDL Clerk's Letter re Transmission of Cases Pursuant to MDL No. 2989: CTO-1))(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami). Counsel notified. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MDL TRANSFER ORDER NO. 2989: Transferring case to the U.S.District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami). Signed by The Judicial Panel onMultidistrict Litigation, on 04/02/2021. (Attachments: #1 MDL Clerk's Letter re Transmission of Cases Pursuant to MDL No. 2989)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Boyle, Gregory. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#35) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 18, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by May 11th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 to remove location(ndrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Redfield, Sabrina Clapp. Service waived by Citadel Securities LLC waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Redfield, Sabrina Clapp. Service waived by Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Redfield, Sabrina Clapp. Service waived by Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Redfield, Sabrina Clapp. Service waived by Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Redfield, Sabrina Clapp. Service waived by Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to APEX CLEARING CORPORATION, Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Barclays Bank PLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, Dough LLC, ETRADE Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Securities LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Freetrade, Ltd., Fumi Holdings, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Denise Redfield, Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Square Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., eToro USA Securities, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15535423.). Filed byDenise Redfield, Sabrina Clapp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lechtzin, Eric) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apex Clearing Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Stash Financial, Inc. is a litigant