This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2019 at 08:12:43 (UTC).

CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD. et al v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD.

ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY

MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD.

MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD.

CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.

ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD.

MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.

Defendants

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

EYAL DESHEH

SIGURDUR OLAFSSON

DEBORAH GRIFFIN

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.

YAACOV ALTMAN

KARE SCHULTZ

YITZHAK PETERBURG

DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE

ALLAN OBERMAN

MAUREEN CAVANAUGH

EREZ VIGODMAN

MICHAEL MCCLELLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID SEAMUS KASKELA

Attorney at KASKELA LAW LLC

201 King Of Prussia Road, Suite 650

Radnor, PA 19087

MICHAEL J. WERNKE

Attorney at POMERANTZ LLP

600 Third Ave 20Th Fl

New York, NY 10016

JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN

Attorney at POMERANTZ LLP

600 Third Ave 20Th Fl

New York, NY 10016

J. ALEXANDER HOOD, II

Attorney at POMERANTZ LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorney

MARC J. SONNENFELD

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT AND SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/4/2019. 4/5/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION to Transfer and [Proposed] Order by YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. (SONNENFELD, MARC) Modified on 4/4/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. YITZHAK PETERBURG waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. YAACOV ALTMAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. SIGURDUR OLAFSSON waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. MICHAEL MCCLELLAN waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. MAUREEN CAVANAUGH waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD.. KARE SCHULTZ waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL J. WERNKE, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #7 ) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/15/2019. 2/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Wernke by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13349550.). (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PLACE THIS MATTER IN SUSPENSE PENDING DEFENDANTS FILING A MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/12/2019. 2/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #3 ); AND J. ALEXANDER HOOD II, ESQ. (DOC. NO. #4 ) ARE GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/12/2019. 2/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Alexander Hood II by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13344662.). (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Lieberman by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13344621.). (KASKELA, DAVID) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD.. (ahf) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD..(ahf) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued as to YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN. 13 Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/7/2019 (ahf) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against YAACOV ALTMAN, DIPANKAR BHATTACHARJEE, MAUREEN CAVANAUGH, EYAL DESHEH, DEBORAH GRIFFIN, MICHAEL MCCLELLAN, ALLAN OBERMAN, SIGURDUR OLAFSSON, YITZHAK PETERBURG, KARE SCHULTZ, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., EREZ VIGODMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 192076.), filed by MEITAV DS PROVIDENT FUNDS AND PENSION LTD., CLAL PENSION AND PROVIDENT LTD., CLAL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD., MENORAH MIVTACHIM PENSIONS AND GEMEL LTD., ATUDOT PENSION FUND FOR EMPLOYEES AND INDEPENDENT WORKERS LTD., ALUMOT MUTUAL FUND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD..(ahf) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MENORAH MIVTACHIM INSURANCE LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Meitav DS Provident Funds And Pension Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant