This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:43:08 (UTC).

Clah v. Gonzales

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Clah filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gonzales. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephan M. Vidmar and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00010

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matilda Clah

Defendant

Jon Gonzales

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth M. Piazza

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880, 87199

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Lawrence A Junker

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880, 87199

Albuquerque, NM 87199-3880

Terry R. Guebert

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199-3880

Robert Gentile

Attorney at Guebert Bruckner PC

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald J. Childress

Attorney at Childress Law Firm

8500 Menaul Blvd Ne Ste A-225

Albuquerque, NM 87112

Urvashi Parkhani

Attorney at Childress Law Firm

8500 Menaul Blvd Ste A-225

Albuquerque, NM 87112

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matilda Clah. Jon Gonzales served on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) Defendant San Juan County Deputy Jon Gonzales' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Violation of Civil Rights Pursuant to 42 USC 1983 by Jon Gonzales. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Shawn Marvin Thomas, Matilda Clah.(Childress, Ronald) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jon Gonzales (Childress, Ronald) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J. Childress on behalf of Jon Gonzales (Childress, Ronald) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#9

(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/7/2022. (kfo) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Matilda Clah & 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Jon Gonzales [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/7/2022. (kfo) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jon Gonzales voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Childress, Ronald)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Matilda Clah voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Gentile, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald J. Childress on behalf of Jon Gonzales (Childress, Ronald) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jon Gonzales (Childress, Ronald) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant San Juan County Deputy Jon Gonzales' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Violation of Civil Rights Pursuant to 42 USC 1983 by Jon Gonzales. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Shawn Marvin Thomas, Matilda Clah.(Childress, Ronald) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matilda Clah. Jon Gonzales served on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Jon Gonzales, U.S. Attorney General (jg) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#6) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) Modified on 2/14/2022 (jg). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8061159 re #1 Complaint, filed by Shawn Marvin Thomas, Matilda Clah (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of Civil Rights Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Jon Gonzales ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Matilda Clah, Shawn Marvin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald J. Childress