This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2020 at 07:11:44 (UTC).

Ciulla v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Ciulla filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Caesars Entertainment Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06436

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Ciulla

Defendant

Caesars Entertainment Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Silberman

Attorney at Joel Silberman ESQ

549 Summit Avenue

Jersey City, NJ 07306

Defendant Attorney

Edward J. Guardaro

Attorney at Fullerton Beck LLP

One West Red Oak Ln, 10604

White Plains, NY 10604

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Guardaro, Edward) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Discovery Plan

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defense counsel is directed to ensure that plaintiff's counsel is aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caesars Entertainment Corporation from Supreme Court, Richmond County, case number 152320/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12064350) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Guardaro, Edward) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Caesars Entertainment Corporation. (Guardaro, Edward) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Defense counsel is directed to ensure that plaintiff's counsel is aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caesars Entertainment Corporation from Supreme Court, Richmond County, case number 152320/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12064350) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Guardaro, Edward) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.