This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2021 at 07:39:10 (UTC).

City of Wauwatosa v. Actavis Pharma Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 City of Wauwatosa filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Actavis Pharma Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45104

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Wauwatosa

Defendants

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Watson Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Inc

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Cardinal Health Inc.

Walgreen Company

Roeschen's Healthcare LLC doing business as Omnicare of Milwaukee

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abasi Major

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Christopher R. Smith

Attorney at Lindquist & Vennum

4200 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gabe Ortiz

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Martin J Phipps

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Meagan M Talafuse

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Defendant Attorneys

Sherry A. Knutson

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Aaron R Wegrzyn

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Conor B. O'Croinin

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder

100 E Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Other Attorneys

Christina M. Putman

Attorney at Adams & Reese - Houston

1221 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77010

Mitchell P Morinec

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

233 S Wacker Dr - Ste 5500

Chicago, IL 60606

Paul Donald Motz

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

233 S Wacker Dr - Ste 5500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

29 #1

*Restricted*

29 #29

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#28

#27

15 #5

Exhibit 5 - April 3, 2019 Order re The Board of County Commissioners of Seminol

15 #4

Exhibit 4 - September 4, 2019 Order re County of Jim Hogg v. Purdue Pharma, L.P

15 #3

Exhibit 3 - List of Cases Transferred from Eastern District of WI to the MDL

15 #1

Exhibit 1 - List of Cases Removed by Diversity-via-Severance and Transferred

15 #15

Main Document

6 #2

Ex. B - Magistrate Judge Consent Form

6 #1

Ex. A - State Court Summons and Complaint

6 #6

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Eastern. Case number 2:21-cv-00757. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Conor B O'Croinin on behalf of Roeschen's Healthcare LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Conor B. O'Croinin (O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation . (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Motz, Paul) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Defenant Union Serv-U Pharmacy, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's the City of Wauwatosa First Amended Complaint by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc.(Motz, Paul) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/12/2021 re #8 Motion for Extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by defendant Union Serv-U Pharmacy; #10 Defendant Roeschen's Healthcare, LLC's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for an Extension of time to File its Responsive Pleading. The court GRANTS defendant Union Serv-U Pharmacy's motion for an extension of time and ORDERS that the time for Union Serv-U Pharmacy to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 14, 2021. The court GRANTS IN PART defendant Roeschen's Healthcare's motion for an extension of time and ORDERS that the time for Roeschen's Healthcare to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the objections to transfer to the MDL. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE by Roeschen's Healthcare LLC re Status Regarding JPML Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - JPML Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Ex. B - Plaintiff's Notice of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Ex. C - JPML Order re Briefing Schedule)(Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Roeschen's Healthcare LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell P Morinec on behalf of Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Mitchell P. Morinec (Morinec, Mitchell) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE Statement by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. (Putman, Christina) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. (Putman, Christina) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Putman on behalf of Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christina M. Putman (Putman, Christina) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Roeschen's Healthcare LLC re Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex. B - Magistrate Judge Consent Form, #3 Ex. C - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by Roeschen's Healthcare LLC. (Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron R Wegrzyn on behalf of Roeschen's Healthcare LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Aaron R. Wegrzyn (Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry A Knutson on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Attorney(s) appearing: Sherry A. Knutson (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021-cv-002935 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3847870) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roeschen's Healthcare LLC d/b/a Omnicare of Milwaukee is a litigant

Latest cases where WATSON PHARMA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant