This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:49:16 (UTC).

CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY filed an Other lawsuit against PURDUE PHARMA L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17155

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

PURDUE PHARMA L.P.

MALLINCKRODT LLC

BEVERLY SACKLER

RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC.

ALLERGAN PLC

WALGREEN BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

THERESA SACKLER

ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

ACTAVIS LLC

RHODES TECHNOLOGIES

RITE AID CORPORATION

CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.

ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC

ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.

WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.

CEPHALON, INC.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEE S. GOLDSMITH

Attorney at GOLDSMITH, RICHMAN, LEVINSON & HARZ, LLP

140 Sylvan Avenue

Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632

JUDITH S. SCOLNICK

Attorney at SCOTT+SCOTT, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, LLP

The Helmsley Building, 230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Defendant Attorneys

RUSSELL LYLE HEWIT

Attorney at DUGHI & HEWIT, PC

340 North Avenue

Cranford, NJ 07016

STEVEN HAHN

Attorney at DUGHI HEWITT & DONALEWSKI

340 North Avenue

Cranford, NJ 07016

Other Attorneys

KURT MICHAEL MULLEN

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY, LLP

53 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

12 #7

Exhibit 6 - Carbon County Remand Motion

12 #11

Exhibit 10 - Monmouth Motion to Stay

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by KURT MICHAEL MULLEN on behalf of JOHN KAPOOR (MULLEN, KURT) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

10 #23

Exhibit 21

10 #17

Exhibit 15

10 #11

Exhibit 9

10 #8

Exhibit 6

12 #13

Exhibit 12 - Protocol for Coordination

10 #10

Exhibit 8

12 #8

Exhibit 7 - Delaware County Remand Motion

10 #9

Exhibit 7

12 #6

Exhibit 5 - Remand Order

12 #9

Exhibit 8 - Judge Dozor Ltr

10 #13

Exhibit 11

12 #12

Exhibit 11 - 4 Transfer Orders

10 #12

Exhibit 10

12 #10

Exhibit 9 - Paterson Stay Motion Reply

10 #16

Exhibit 14

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by KURT MICHAEL MULLEN on behalf of JOHN KAPOOR (MULLEN, KURT) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY re #10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Trenton Remand Brief, #3 Exhibit 2 - Worcester Decision, #4 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of 12-13-17 Teleconference, #5 Exhibit 4 - Order Regarding Remands, #6 Exhibit 5 - Remand Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - Carbon County Remand Motion, #8 Exhibit 7 - Delaware County Remand Motion, #9 Exhibit 8 - Judge Dozor Ltr, #10 Exhibit 9 - Paterson Stay Motion Reply, #11 Exhibit 10 - Monmouth Motion to Stay, #12 Exhibit 11 - 4 Transfer Orders, #13 Exhibit 12 - Protocol for Coordination)(SCOLNICK, JUDITH) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY re #8 MOTION to Remand (SCOLNICK, JUDITH) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEF in Opposition filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION re #8 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand by CITY OF TRENTON, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - CTO-111, #4 Exhibit B - Transfer Orders, #5 Exhibit C - West Virginia decision, #6 Exhibit D - Granite City, Ill decision, #7 Exhibit E - Oklahoma decision, #8 Exhibit F - Anderson Cty, SC decision, #9 Exhibit G - Worcester decision, #10 Exhibit H - Boston decision, #11 Exhibit I - El Monte decision, #12 Exhibit J - Monmouth Stay motion, #13 Exhibit K - JPML Ntc of Hrg Session, #14 Exhibit L - 2-16-18 MDL Order re Remands, #15 Exhibit M - MDL Hrg Tr re remands, #16 Exhibit N - NJ-AG Janssen CPT)(SCOLNICK, JUDITH) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by PURDUE PHARMA INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P. OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulating Defendants, without waiver of any defenses, including lack of personal jurisdiction defenses, shall have through and including 30 days after the later of (i) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, should Plaintiff file one, or (ii) the final decision of the Judicial Panel on the Multidistrict Litigation regarding any transfer of this case to the MDL, to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/05/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN HAHN on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (HAHN, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice to LEE S. GOLDSMITH re mandatory eFiling. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - LEE S. GOLDSMITH appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCKESSON CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MER L 1167 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916489), filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix A to Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.