This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:29 (UTC).

City of Superior v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 City of Superior filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45331

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Superior

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo International plc

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Actavis LLC

Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Insys Therapeutics Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Omnicare Distribution Center LLC

Cephalon Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven G. Kluender

Attorney at Previant Law Firm

310 W. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53203

Casey Paul Shorts

Attorney at Previant Law Firm

310 W. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53207

 

Court Documents

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00340. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/15/2019. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

2 #7

Summons Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

2 #5

Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

2 #17

Summons Omnicare Distribution Center LLC

2 #18

Summons Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.

2 #4

Summons Endo International. Inc.

2 #6

Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

2 #19

Summons Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.

2 #9

Summons Mallinckrodt LLC

2 #10

Summons Allergan PLC

2 #11

Summons Watson Laboratories, Inc.

2 #12

Summons Actavis LLC

2 #13

Summons Actavis Pharma, Inc.

2 #14

Summons Amerisourcebergen Corporation

2 #15

Summons Cardinal Health, Inc.

2 #16

Summons McKesson Corporation

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00340. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/15/2019. (kwf) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Summons Cephalon, Inc., #2 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #3 Summons Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #4 Summons Endo International. Inc., #5 Summons Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #7 Summons Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #8 Summons Mallinckrodt PLC, #9 Summons Mallinckrodt LLC, #10 Summons Allergan PLC, #11 Summons Watson Laboratories, Inc., #12 Summons Actavis LLC, #13 Summons Actavis Pharma, Inc., #14 Summons Amerisourcebergen Corporation, #15 Summons Cardinal Health, Inc., #16 Summons McKesson Corporation, #17 Summons Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, #18 Summons Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., #19 Summons Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.) (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2455285.), filed by City of Superior, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Purdue Pharma, L.P., #3 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #4 Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #5 Summons - Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #6 Summons - Watson Laboratories, Inc., #7 Summons - McKesson Corporation, #8 Summons - Cardinal Health, Inc., #9 Summons - AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #10 Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #11 Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. I, #12 Summons - Cephalon, Inc., #13 Summons - Allergan PLC, #14 Summons - Omnicare Distribution Center LLC, #15 Summons - Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., #16 Summons - Endo International PLC, #17 Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC, #18 Summons - Actavis LLC, #19 Summons - Actavis, Inc., #20 Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC, #21 Summons - Actavis Pharma) (Shorts, Casey) Modified on 4/30/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.