This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2020 at 09:32:31 (UTC).

City of San Jose, California et al v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 City of San Jose, California filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins, Lucy H. Koh, Edward M. Chen and Richard R. Clifton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05167

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Judges

Lucy H. Koh

Edward M. Chen

Richard R. Clifton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Black Alliance For Just Immigration

King County, Washington

Sam Liccardo

Lovette Kargbo-Thompson

City of San Jose, California

Zerihoun Yilma

Arlington County, Virginia

Santcha Etienne

Defendants

Cheryl L Johnson

Wilbur L. Ross

Donald J. Trump

Steven Dillingham

U.S. Census Bureau

U.S. Department of Commerce

Amicus Curiae

Libby Garland

Ron Wyden

Steven Ruggles

U.S. House of Representatives

Rachel Buff

Mazie K. Hirono

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jon Greenbaum

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1401 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Sadik Harry Huseny

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Richard P. Bress

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Shannon Danielle Lankenau

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amit Makker

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ezra D Rosenberg

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1500 K Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Steven Mark Bauer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ajay P Saini

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1500 K Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Dorian Lawrence Spence

Attorney at Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1401 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Kristen Clarke

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights

1500 K St Nw Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant Attorneys

Brad Prescott Rosenberg

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 883

Washington, DC 20044

Daniel D. Mauler

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Ave, Nw, Room 6141

Washington, DC 20530

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Richard W. Clary

Attorney at Cravath Swaine and Moore LLP

825 8Th Ave, Worldwide Plaza

New York, NY 10019

Tamara Irene Devitt

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Mark R Trachtenberg

Attorney at Haynes and Boone LLP

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77010

Douglas N. Letter

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Other Attorneys

Blaine I. Green

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop LLP

Post Office Box 2824

San Francisco, CA 94126

R. Matthew Wise

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Dustin James Chase-Woods

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael John Pisko

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

87 #2

Exhibit B

87 #1

Exhibit A

#87

86 #5

Supplemental Declaration of Rodney Ellis

86 #4

Declaration of Umair A. Shah, M.D., M.P.H.

86 #3

Declaration of Michelle Ramsey

86 #2

Declaration of Dwight Dively

86 #1

Expert Declaration of Andrew Reamer, Ph.D.

#86

#7

#6

#4

3 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Attachment 1

#1

175 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Declaration of Shannon D. Lankenau in Support of #86 Reply to Opposition/Response,, filed byArlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) REPLY (re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) and in Opposition to Defendants' #84 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byArlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Expert Declaration of Andrew Reamer, Ph.D., #2 Declaration of Dwight Dively, #3 Declaration of Michelle Ramsey, #4 Declaration of Umair A. Shah, M.D., M.P.H., #5 Supplemental Declaration of Rodney Ellis, #6 Declaration of Gabrielle D. Boutin)(Bress, Richard) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Brief re #84 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 63), #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Amicus Brief in Support of Defs filed byImmigration Reform Law Institute. (Related document(s) #84 , #63 ) (Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 63) filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/21/2020. Replies due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John M. Abowd, #2 Declaration Declaration of Albert E. Fontenot)(Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2020) (Entered: 09/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine I. Green of Dustin Chase-Woods (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Pisko ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14893916.) filed by The League of Women Voters. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Certificate of Good Standing)(Pisko, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine I. Green (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Brief re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byThe League of Women Voters. (Related document(s) #63 ) (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Brief ("Brief of Amici Curiae Historians in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment") filed byMargo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalia Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Clary, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma.. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/11/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Richard P. Bress Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Steven Dillingham, Cheryl L Johnson, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/11/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Greenbaum (Greenbaum, Jon) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14741547.) filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bress, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Steven Dillingham, Cheryl L Johnson, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14741535.). Filed byZerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Black Alliance for Just Immigration is a litigant

Latest cases where ARLINGTON COUNTY, VIRGINIA is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Census Bureau is a litigant