This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 15:19:09 (UTC).

City of Preston v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 City of Preston filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are B. Lynn Winmill and David C. Nye. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

B. Lynn Winmill

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mallinckrodt, LLC

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

City of Preston

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Amerisourcebergen Corporation

Purdue Pharma LP

Endo International PLC

Actavis LLC

Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc

McKesson Corporation

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Omnicare Distribution Center LLC

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Mallinckrodt, PLC

Allergan Plc

Cephalon, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven P Wieland

Attorney at Mooney Wieland PLLC

405 S 8Th Street, Suite 295

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of Court of electronic case transfer to the Northern District of Ohio re #4 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel. (cjs)

#4

(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Northern District of Ohio re CTO-79 for MDL No. 2804. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

3 #1

Text Only Entry Minute Order

#3

(#3) ORDER- CTO-79 by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re MDL No.2804. (Attachments: #1 Text Only Entry Minute Order)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by City of Preston, Mallinckrodt, LLC. (Wieland, Steven)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Preston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1839268.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Wieland, Steven)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketConfirmation of transfer received from the Northern District of Ohio 2/14/2019, case no. 1:19-op-45067. (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clerk of Court of electronic case transfer to the Northern District of Ohio re #4 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel. (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Northern District of Ohio re CTO-79 for MDL No. 2804. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER- CTO-79 by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re MDL No.2804. (Attachments: #1 Text Only Entry Minute Order)(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00031-DCN for all future filings. (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by City of Preston, Mallinckrodt, LLC. (Wieland, Steven)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against City of Preston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1839268.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Wieland, Steven)

    Read MoreRead Less