This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2021 at 08:38:15 (UTC).

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA v. CVS RX SERVICES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 CITY OF PHILADELPHIA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS RX SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04701

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA

Defendants

CVS RX SERVICES, INC.

CVS PHARMACY, INC.

PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY L.L.C.

RITE AID CORPORATION

RITE AID HDQTRS CORP.

ECKERD CORPORATION d/b/a RITE AID LIVERPOOL DISTRIBUTION CENTER

RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC.

RITE AID DRUG PALACE, INC.

RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC

WALGREEN CO

WALGREEN EASTERN CO., INC.

WALGREEN BOOTS ALLIANCE INC

WALMART, INC. f/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC.

WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

WALMART STORES EAST, INC.

ACME MARKETS, INC. d/b/a SAV-ON PHARMACY

ALBERTSONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGORY B. HELLER

Attorney at McLaughlin & Lauricella, P.C.

One Commerce Square2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JERRY DESIDERATO

Attorney at Dilworth Paxson LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3500E

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

STEVEN N. HERMAN

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER LLP

1800 M Street Nw Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

CONOR B. O'CROININ

Attorney at ZUCKERMAN SPAEDER

100 East Pratt St Suite 2440

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CONOR B. O'CROININ IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/29/21. 11/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Conor B. O'Croinin on behalf of CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS RX SERVICES, INC., PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY L.L.C. (HERMAN, STEVEN) Modified on 11/29/2021 (md, ). (Filing fee paid separately $40 receipt number 0313-15573940) Modified on 11/29/2021 (md, ). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation with Certificate of Service filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1-2

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1-11

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Letter dated November 5, 2021 by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS RX SERVICES, INC., PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY L.L.C. and CVS INDIANA, L.L.C. OF STATE COURT ORDER STAYING DEFTS RESPONSE DEADLINE (HERMAN, STEVEN) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Brief Page Enlargement with Certificate of Service by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Expedite filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.with Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service, Exhibit A, and Proposed Order.(DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #6

Case Management Track Form

1 #5

Designation Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (consent)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (pleadings)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (transfer order)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDOC # 10 MAILED TO O'CROININ (rf, ) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Telephone Conference held on 11/29/21 (rf, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CONOR B. O'CROININ IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/29/21. 11/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Conor B. O'Croinin on behalf of CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS RX SERVICES, INC., PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY L.L.C. (HERMAN, STEVEN) Modified on 11/29/2021 (md, ). (Filing fee paid separately $40 receipt number 0313-15573940) Modified on 11/29/2021 (md, ). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation with Certificate of Service filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Expedite filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS RX SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(HERMAN, STEVEN) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS RX SERVICES, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-11)(HERMAN, STEVEN) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter dated November 5, 2021 by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS RX SERVICES, INC., PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY L.L.C. and CVS INDIANA, L.L.C. OF STATE COURT ORDER STAYING DEFTS RESPONSE DEADLINE (HERMAN, STEVEN) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Brief Page Enlargement with Certificate of Service by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION to Expedite filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.with Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service, Exhibit A, and Proposed Order.(DESIDERATO, JERRY) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS RX SERVICES, INC., CVS PHARMACY, INC., PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY L.L.C. and CVS INDIANA, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15502475), filed by CVS RX SERVICES, INC., CVS PHARMACY, INC., PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (transfer order), #2 Exhibit 2 (pleadings), #3 Exhibit 3 (consent), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(HERMAN, STEVEN) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACME MARKETS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS RX SERVICES INC. is a litigant