This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2021 at 07:38:50 (UTC).

City of Oak Creek v. Actavis Pharma Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 City of Oak Creek filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Actavis Pharma Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45103

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Oak Creek

Defendants

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Watson Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Inc

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

McKesson Corporation

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Cardinal Health Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher R. Smith

Attorney at Lindquist & Vennum

4200 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gabe Ortiz

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Martin J Phipps

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Meagan M Talafuse

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Defendant Attorney

Sherry A. Knutson

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Other Attorneys

Aaron R Wegrzyn

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 3800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Conor B. O'Croinin

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder

100 E Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Brittany L Van Roo

Attorney at Simpson & Deardorff SC

311 E Chicago St - Ste 410

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Maria P Bucci

Attorney at Simpson & Deardorff SC

311 E Chicago St - Ste 410

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Thomas J Binder

Attorney at Simpson & Deardorff SC

311 E Chicago St - Ste 410

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Christina M. Putman

Attorney at Adams & Reese - Houston

1221 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77010

Mitchell P Morinec

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

233 S Wacker Dr - Ste 5500

Chicago, IL 60606

Paul Donald Motz

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

233 S Wacker Dr - Ste 5500

Chicago, IL 60606

Monte E Weiss

Attorney at Weiss Law Office SC

1017 W Glen Oaks Ln - Ste 207

Mequon, WI 53092

 

Court Documents

37 #1

*Restricted*

37 #37

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#36

#35

#34

#33

21 #4

Exhibit 4 - September 4, 2019 Order re County of Jim Hogg v. Purdue Pharma, L.P

21 #2

Exhibit 2 - List of Federal Question Removed Cases Transferred to MDL

21 #1

Exhibit 1 - List of Cases Removed by Diversity-via-Severance and Transferred

6 #2

Ex. B - Magistrate Judge Consent Form

6 #1

Ex. A - State Court Summons and Complaint

6 #6

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-State Court Docket

1 #1

Main Document

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Eastern. Case number 2:21-cv-00754. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany L Van Roo on behalf of Hayward Pharmacy Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brittany L. Van Roo (Van Roo, Brittany) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Conor B O'Croinin on behalf of Roeschens Healthcare LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Conor B. O'Croinin (O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ANSWER to Complaint by Laabs Inc.(Weiss, Monte) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation . (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Motz, Paul) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Defenant Union Serv-U Pharmacy, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's the City of Oak Creek First Amended Complaint by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc.(Motz, Paul) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/12/2021 re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by defendant Union Serv-U Pharmacy; #10 Defendant Roeschen's Healthcare, LLC's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for an Extension of Time to File its Responsive Pleading; #15 Expedited Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by defendant Hayward Pharmacy. The court GRANTS defendant Union Serv-U Pharmacy's motion for an extension of time and ORDERS that the time for Union Serv-U Pharmacy to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 14, 2021. The court GRANTS IN PART defendant Roeschen's Healthcare's motion for an extension of time and ORDERS that the time for Roeschen's Healthcare to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the objections to transfer to the MDL. The court DENIES AS MOOT defendant Hayward Pharmacy's motion for an extension of time; Hayward Pharmacy filed its answer on June 24, 2021, dkt. no. 18. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE by Roeschens Healthcare LLC re Status Regarding JPML Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - JPML Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Ex. B - Plaintiff's Notice of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Ex. C - JPML Order re Briefing Schedule)(Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE Statement by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. (Putman, Christina) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. (Putman, Christina) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Putman on behalf of Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christina M. Putman (Putman, Christina) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENTAL by Roeschens Healthcare LLC Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex. B - Magistrate Judge Consent Form, #3 Ex. C - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wegrzyn, Aaron) Modified on 6/22/2021 (bx). [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by Roeschens Healthcare LLC. (Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron R Wegrzyn on behalf of Roeschens Healthcare LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Aaron R. Wegrzyn (Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (bx) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry A Knutson on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Attorney(s) appearing: Sherry A. Knutson (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021-cv-002936 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3847795) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/14/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATSON PHARMA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant