This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2021 at 07:18:57 (UTC).

CITY OF NICEVILLE FLORIDA v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 CITY OF NICEVILLE FLORIDA filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00770

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The City of Niceville, Florida

Defendants

ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC

ALLERGAN PLC

ACTAVIS PHARMA INC

Pd-Rx Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC

MCKESSON CORPORATION

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC

WALMART STORES EAST LP doing business as Wal- Mart Warehouse #45 doing business as Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse

ALBERTSON'S LLC

ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC

Alvogen, Inc.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc

WALMART INC

ACTAVIS PLC

Cephalon, Inc

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER J MOUGEY

Attorney at LEVIN PAPANTONIO RAFFERTY - PENSACOLA FL

316 S Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 4 Interdistrict Transfer. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:21op45081,filed 06/14/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

3 #1

Email Request

#3

(#3) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-197) re MDL 2804 to Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Email Request) (jcw) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6093802.), filed by The City of Niceville, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOUGEY, PETER) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 4 Interdistrict Transfer. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:21op45081,filed 06/14/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#4) Interdistrict Transfer to the Northern District of Ohio re MDL 2804. (jcw) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-197) re MDL 2804 to Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Email Request) (jcw) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The clerk will issue summons upon submission. You may obtain the 2 page summons form by visiting our website @ www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Click on Forms & Publications; national court forms; AO 440 Summons in a Civil Action (revised 6/12). (jcw) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6093802.), filed by The City of Niceville, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MOUGEY, PETER) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alvogen Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant