This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 06:42:42 (UTC).

City of Nettleton, Mississippi v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 City of Nettleton, Mississippi filed an Other lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45151

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Nettleton, Mississippi

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cephalon Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Courtney B. Smith

Attorney at Sims & Sims

809 Third Avenue North, Po Box 648

Columbus, MS 39703

 

Court Documents

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 1:19-cv-00050. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1650689, filed by City of Nettleton, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 1:19-cv-00050. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1650689, filed by City of Nettleton, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) [Transferred from msnd on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant