This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2021 at 09:15:46 (UTC).

City of Miami, Florida v. Eli Lilly And Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 City of Miami, Florida filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Eli Lilly And Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-22636

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Miami, Florida

Defendants

Eli Lilly And Company

Novo Nordisk Inc.

Express Scripts Holding Company

Express Scripts, Inc.

ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC.

Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.

CVS Health Corporation

CAREMARK RX, L.L.C.

Caremark Florida Mail Pharmacy, LLC

Optum, Inc.

AETNA RX HOME DELIVERY, LLC

AETNA PHARMACY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC

Caremark PCS Health, L.L.C.

Caremark, L.L.C.

OptumRx, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ariane Wolinsky

Attorney at Mansfield Bronstein& Stone, LLP

500 E. Broward Blvd., Suite 1450

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33394

David Stone

Attorney at David Stone, P.A.

915 Miami Center, 201 S.Biscayne Boulevard

Miami-Dade, FL 33131

Gary Neil Mansfield

Attorney at Mansfield Bronstein & Stone, LLP

500 E. Broward Boulevard, Suite 1450

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33394

Marc Jay Bern

Attorney at Marc J. Bern & Partners, LLP

One Grand Central Place

Defendant Attorneys

Alan David Lash

Attorney at Lash & Goldberg

100 Se 2Nd Street, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131-2100

Henry Liu

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Shankar Duraiswamy

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Ziwei Song

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street, Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105

Clay Matthew Carlton

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis , Bockius LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 5300

Miami, FL 33131

Jason R. Scherr

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Patrick A. Harvey

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Coral Del Mar Lopez

Attorney at Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff and Sitterson PA

150 West Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33012

Craig D. Singer

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Daniel M. Dockery

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Enu A. Mainigi

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 Twelfth Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Jay Brian Shapiro

Attorney at Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson

150 W Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 W Peachtree Street, Ne, One Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Sandra Lynn Heller

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

515 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Brian D. Boone

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

101 South Tryon Street, Suite 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

D. Andrew Hatchett

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W. Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

40 #2

Text of Proposed Order

40 #40

Main Document

39 #2

Text of Proposed Order

39 #1

Certification

39 #39

Main Document

38 #1

Certification

38 #38

Main Document

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Certification

5 #5

Main Document

#4

#3

1 #3

Supplement State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Docket Sheet State Court Docket and Filings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Miami, Florida.(Mansfield, Gary) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc. Only by City of Miami, Florida (Mansfield, Gary) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the moving Defendants' motions to appear pro hac vice. #38 , #39 , #40 . Attorneys D. Andrew Hatchett, Liz Broadway Brown, and Brian D. Boone are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the moving Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the e-mail addresses set forth in the respective motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ntd) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CLERK'S NOTICE - Local counsel Frances Guasch De La Guardia must sign/file documents under the name listed on the SDFL Roll of Attorneys, Frances Fernandez Guasch. See #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/name-changes. It is not necessary to refile these motions. re #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Liz Broadway Brown. , #38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for D. Andrew Hatchett. , #40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian D. Boone. . (pt) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian D. Boone. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14965223 by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc.. Responses due by 9/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guasch, Frances) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Liz Broadway Brown. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14965178 by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc.. Responses due by 9/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guasch, Frances) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for D. Andrew Hatchett. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14965107 by Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc.. Responses due by 9/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guasch, Frances) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the moving Defendants' motions to appear pro hac vice. #33 , #34 , #35 . Attorneys Daniel M. Dockery, Craig D. Singer, and Enu A. Mainigi are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the moving Defendants. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the e-mail addresses set forth in the respective motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PAPERLESS ORDER: granting in part the parties' joint motion for extension of time for the parties to conduct their discovery and scheduling conference and file their required report. #32 . In their motion, the parties request an additional 120 days to conduct their conference and file the required report, however, the Court finds the requested extension to be too lengthy. Accordingly, the Court will grant the parties an additional 75 days to file their required report, which will now be due by November 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAttorney Daniel M. Dockery representing CVS Health Corporation (Defendant) and Caremark Rx, L.L.C. (Defendant) and Caremark PCS Health, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark Florida Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Defendant); and Aetna Rx Home Delivery, LLC (Defendant); ; Attorney Enu A. Mainigi representing CVS Health Corporation (Defendant) and Caremark Rx, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark PCS Health, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark Florida Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Defendant); and Aetna Rx Home Delivery, LLC (Defendant); and Aetna Pharmacy Management Services, LLC (Defendant); ; Attorney Craig D. Singer representing CVS Health Corporation (Defendant) and Caremark Rx, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark PCS Health, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark, L.L.C. (Defendant); and Caremark Florida Mail Pharmacy, LLC (Defendant); and Aetna Rx Home Delivery, LLC (Defendant); and Aetna Pharmacy Management Services, LLC (Defendant); Activated. (pt) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darcie Ahern-Sweet Thompson on behalf of OPTUMRX INC, Optum, Inc.. Attorney Darcie Ahern-Sweet Thompson added to party OPTUMRX INC(pty:dft), Attorney Darcie Ahern-Sweet Thompson added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft). (Thompson, Darcie) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sandra Lynn Heller on behalf of OPTUMRX INC, Optum, Inc.. Attorney Sandra Lynn Heller added to party OPTUMRX INC(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Lynn Heller added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft). (Heller, Sandra) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Donald L. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 7/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (vjk) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frances Fernandez Guasch on behalf of OPTUMRX INC, Optum, Inc.. Attorney Frances Fernandez Guasch added to party OPTUMRX INC(pty:dft), Attorney Frances Fernandez Guasch added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft). (Guasch, Frances) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick A. Harvey. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14874960 by ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. Responses due by 8/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carlton, Clay) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason R. Scherr. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14874930 by ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. Responses due by 8/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carlton, Clay) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Carlton, Clay) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Marc J. Bern, Jason R. Scherr and Patrick A. Harvey, mailing date July 23, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14868238, filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet State Court Docket and Filings, #3 Supplement State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Carlton, Clay) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aetna Rx Home Delivery, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Caremark PCS Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVO NORDISK INC. is a litigant