This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 08:57:22 (UTC).

City of Memphis v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 City of Memphis filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45220

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Memphis

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Amerisoucebergen Drug Corporation

Cephalon Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company

Purdue Pharma Inc

Cardinal Health Inc.

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson and Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Florence M. Johnson

Attorney at JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, PLLC

1407 Union Avenue, Ste 1002

Memphis, TN 38104

James D. O'Leary

Attorney at O'Leary, Shelton, Corrigan, Peterson, Dalton & Quillin

23Rd Floor, 1034 South Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63117

James T. Corrigan

Attorney at O'Leary, Shelton, Corrigan, Peterson, Dalton & Quillin

23Rd Floor, 1034 South Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63117

Michael J. Quillin

Attorney at O'Leary, Shelton, Corrigan, Peterson, Dalton & Quillin

23Rd Floor, 1034 South Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63117

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

#6

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.; Omnicare Distribution Center LLC; The Kroger Co.; PharMEDium Services LLC; SpecGx, LLC; Sandoz, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; OrthoMcNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; H. D. Smith, LLC d/b/a HD Smith f/k/a H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.; H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC; H. D. Smith Holding Company; Beverly Sackler; David A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Jonathan D. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Mortimer D. A. Sackler; Richard S. Sackler; Theresa Sackler; Stuart Baker; Raymond Sackler Trust; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L. P.; Rhodes Technologies; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; P.F. Laboratories, Inc.; Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. Filed by City of Memphis. (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Memphis. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019 filed on behalf of City of Memphis (Quillin, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Attorney Appearance by James D. O'Leary filed by on behalf of City of Memphis. (B,R) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Attorney Appearance by James T. Corrigan filed by on behalf of City of Memphis. (B,R) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Quillin filed on behalf of City of Memphis. (B,R) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Western. Case number 2:19-cv-02159. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -85) MDL No. 2804. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on March 28, 2019. (agj) [Transferred from tnwd on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) [Transferred from tnwd on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) [Transferred from tnwd on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) [Transferred from tnwd on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) [Transferred from tnwd on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3008834), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Florence) [Transferred from tnwd on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant