This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2019 at 07:14:28 (UTC).

City of Medford v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 City of Medford filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45110

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Medford

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mark Timney

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

McKesson Corporation

Frank Boer

Insys Therapeutics Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Judy Lewent

Watson Laboratories Inc.

P.F. Laboratories, Inc.

Allergan PLC

jonathan Sackler

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Theresa Sackler

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family

Actavis LLC

Ralph Snyderman

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Bonsignore

Attorney at Bonsignore Trial Lawyers

193 Plummer Hill Road

Belmont, NH 03220

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-81 in MDL Case 2804 received from the Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 81 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7535625 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The City of Medford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Bonsignore, Robert) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#8

(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:19-cv-10262. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

1 #2

Category Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:19-cv-10262. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • (#7) Case transferred to the U.S. Northern District Court of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 3/1/2019. Case transferred electronically to the U.S. Northern District Court of Ohio. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-81 in MDL Case 2804 received from the Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 81 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 02/11/2019, receipt number 0101-7535624. (Tran, Henry) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7535625 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The City of Medford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Bonsignore, Robert) [Transferred from mad on 3/5/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.