This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 08:24:12 (UTC).

Kenner City v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Kenner City filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana Douglas and Sarah S. Vance. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02167

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Kenner City

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company

HDI Global Specialty SE

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

Transverse Specialty Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Dustin L. Poche

Attorney at Irpino, Avin & Hawkins Law Firm

2216 Magazine St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Roderick Alvendia

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly, & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Anthony D. Irpino

Attorney at Irpino, Avin & Hawkins (New Orleans)

2216 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeanne K. Demarest

Attorney at Law Office of Alvendia Kelly & Demarest

909 Poydras St., Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

John Bartholomew Kelly, III

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly, & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Phillip J. Rew

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

D. Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kyle M. Truxillo

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard R. Stedman, II

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in Support. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/9/2022. (mm) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #7 MOTION to Continue Hearing. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

8 #4

Proposed Order

8 #3

Proposed Pleading-Exhibit B

8 #2

Proposed Pleading-Exhibit A

8 #1

Proposed Pleading

8 #8

Main Document

7 #7

Main Document

4 #6

Proposed Order

4 #5

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

4 #4

Exhibit 3-Settlement Clause

4 #3

Exhibit 2-Arbitration Clause

4 #2

Exhibit 1-Policy

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

4 #4

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Supplemental Memorandum filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company in support of #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(mm) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in Support. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/9/2022. (mm) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #7 MOTION to Continue Hearing. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in Support re: rec. doc. 4 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Pleading-Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Continue Hearing re: rec. doc. 4 by Kenner City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Irpino, Anthony) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, HDI Global Specialty SE for the following reason: duplicate payment; receipt number ALAEDC-9445034. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London (mm) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Policy, #3 Exhibit 2-Arbitration Clause, #4 Exhibit 3-Settlement Clause, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, COUNTERCLAIM against Kenner City by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Arbitration Clause, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy) Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Transverse Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 828-749 C (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9445064) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause, #3 Exhibit C - Policy, #4 Consents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip J. Rew added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft).(Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant