This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 08:27:08 (UTC).

CITY OF HOBOKEN v. EXXON MOBIL CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 CITY OF HOBOKEN filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against EXXON MOBIL CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and John Michael Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-14243

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF HOBOKEN

Defendants

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

PHILLIPS 66

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

CHEVRON CORP.

EXXON MOBIL CORP.

SHELL OIL COMPANY

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE

CONOCOPHILLIPS

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

BP AMERICA, INC.

ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC

BP P.L.C.

PHV YAHONNES CLEARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GERALD KROVATIN

Attorney at KROVATIN NAU LLC

60 Park Place, Suite 1100

Newark, NJ 07102

HELEN A. NAU

Attorney at KROVATIN NAU LLC

60 Park Place, Suite 1100

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant Attorneys

SYLVIA-REBECCA GUTIERREZ

Attorney at DAY PITNEY LLP

1 Jefferson Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054

THOMAS R. VALEN

Attorney at GIBBONS, PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102-5310

ANTHONY PIUS CALLAGHAN

Attorney at GIBBONS, PC

One Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102-5310

KEVIN HARRY MARINO

Attorney at MARINO TORTORELLA & BOYLE, PC

437 Southern Boulevard

Chatham, NJ 07928-1488

THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

JOHN D. TORTORELLA

Attorney at MARINO, TORTORELLA & BOYLE, P.C.

437 Southern Boulevard

Chatham, NJ 07928-1488

JOEL M. SILVERSTEIN

Attorney at STERN & KILCULLEN, LLC

325 Columbia Turnpike

Florham Park, NJ 07932

HERBERT JAY STERN

Attorney at STERN & KILCULLEN, LLC

325 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 110

Florham Park, NJ 07932

LOLY G. TOR

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP

One Newark Center

Newark, NJ 07102

DENNIS M. TOFT

Attorney at CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC

One Boland Drive

West Orange, NJ 07052

MICHAEL KEVIN PLUMB

Attorney at CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC

1 Boland Drive

West Orange, NJ 07052

JEFFREY SCOTT CHIESA

Attorney at CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC

One Boland Drive

West Orange, NJ 07052

JEFFREY MATTHEW BEYER

Attorney at RIKER DANZIG SCHERER HYLAND & PERRETTI LLP

1 Speedwell Avenue, Headquarters Plaza

Morristown, NJ 07962-1981

ANTHONY J. ZARILLO, JR.

Attorney at Riker Danzig Scherer Hyland & Perretti LLP

One Speedwell Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07962-1981

PAUL JOSEPH FISHMAN

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

One Gateway Center, Suite 1025

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#93

(#93) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William E. Thomson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#92

(#92) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrea E. Neuman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#91

(#91) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas G. Hungar to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#90

(#90) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joshua D. Dick to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#89

(#89) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#88

(#88) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian D. Schmalzbach to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11633798.) (ZARILLO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#87

(#87) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew G. McBride to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11633698.) (ZARILLO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#86

(#86) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Amanda S. Hawkins to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11633666.) (ZARILLO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

1 #60

Exhibit 59 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #59

Exhibit 58 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #58

Exhibit 57 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #57

Exhibit 56 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #24

Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #23

Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #20

Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #19

Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #4

Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

1 #3

Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick

247 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice fee: $ 750, receipt number NEW043763 as to Theodore J. Boutros, Jr., Andrea E. Neuman, William E. Thomson, Thomas G. Hungar and Joshua D. Dick (ams, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, MATTHEW T. HEARTNEY, JONATHAN W. HUGHES, JOHN D. LOMBARDO, DIANA E. REITER, AMANDA S. HAWKINS, ANDREW G. MCBRIDE, BRIAN D. SCHMALZBACH, THEODORE J. BOUTROUS, JR, JOSHUA D. DICK, THOMAS G. HUNGAR, ANDREA E. NEUMAN and WILLIAM E. THOMSON, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William E. Thomson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrea E. Neuman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas G. Hungar to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joshua D. Dick to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SILVERSTEIN, JOEL) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian D. Schmalzbach to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11633798.) (ZARILLO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew G. McBride to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11633698.) (ZARILLO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Amanda S. Hawkins to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11633666.) (ZARILLO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, SHELL OIL COMPANY of Consent to Removal (TOR, LOLY) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. (CHIESA, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL JOSEPH FISHMAN on behalf of BP AMERICA, INC., BP P.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FISHMAN, PAUL) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN D. TORTORELLA on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TORTORELLA, JOHN) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARINO, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 11.2 Certification, #2 Local Rule 201.1 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(MARINO, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN HARRY MARINO on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARINO, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE V. WELLS, JR on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (WELLS, THEODORE) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEVRON CORP., CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.. (STERN, HERBERT) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHEVRON CORP., CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number HUD-L-003179-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11483747), filed by CHEVRON CORP., CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Dick with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #22 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #23 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #24 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #25 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #26 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #27 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #28 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #29 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #30 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #31 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #32 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #33 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #34 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #35 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #36 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #37 Exhibit 36 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #38 Exhibit 37 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #39 Exhibit 38 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #40 Exhibit 39 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #41 Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #42 Exhibit 41 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #43 Exhibit 42 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #44 Exhibit 43 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #45 Exhibit 44 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #46 Exhibit 45 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #47 Exhibit 46 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #48 Exhibit 47 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #49 Exhibit 48 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #50 Exhibit 49 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #51 Exhibit 50 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #52 Exhibit 51 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #53 Exhibit 52 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #54 Exhibit 53 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #55 Exhibit 54 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #56 Exhibit 55 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #57 Exhibit 56 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #58 Exhibit 57 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #59 Exhibit 58 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #60 Exhibit 59 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #61 Exhibit 60 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #62 Exhibit 61 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #63 Exhibit 62 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #64 Exhibit 63 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #65 Exhibit 64 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #66 Exhibit 65 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #67 Exhibit 66 to Declaration of Joshua D. Dick, #68 Declaration of Herbert J. Stern, #69 Civil Cover Sheet, #70 Certification pursuant to L.Civ.R. 11.2, #71 Certificate of Service)(STERN, HERBERT) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILLIP 66 COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ExxonMobil Oil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant