This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 19:46:34 (UTC).

City of Gulf Shores, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 City of Gulf Shores, Alabama filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-OP-45019

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The City of Gulf Shores, Alabama

Defendants

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Cardinal Health Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Johnson and Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Normaco Inc

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Actavis LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cameron Lee Hogan

Attorney at Lloyd & Hogan

2871 Acton Road

Birmingham, AL 35243

Christina Diane Crow

Attorney at Jinks Crow & Dickson

P.O. Box 350

Union Springs, AL 36089

Diandra S. Debrosse Zimmermann

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

420 20Th Street, Suite 2525

Birmingham, AL 35203

Emily Hawk Mills

Attorney at Cusimano Roberts & Mills

153 South 9Th Street

Gadsden, AL 35901

Gregory Martin Zarzaur

Attorney at Zarzaur Mujumdar & Debrosse

2332 2Nd Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35205

Joshua Patrick Hayes

Attorney at Prince Glover & Hayes

701 Rice Mine Road North

Tuscaloosa, AL 35406

Richard Stanislaw Frankowski

2126 15Th Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/22/2022)

3 #3

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

3 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Southern. Case number 1:22-cv-00102. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. (cjr) [Transferred from alsd on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The City of Gulf Shores, Alabama ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2971646, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/2/2022. (Crow, Christina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (fz). [Transferred from alsd on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant