This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2021 at 07:01:04 (UTC).

City of Greenfield v. Actavis Pharma Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 City of Greenfield filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Actavis Pharma Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45102

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Greenfield

Defendants

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Watson Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Inc

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

McKesson Corporation

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Cardinal Health Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abasi Major

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Christopher R. Smith

Attorney at Lindquist & Vennum

4200 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gabe Ortiz

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Martin J Phipps

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Meagan M Talafuse

Attorney at Phipps Ortiz Talafuse PLLC

102 9Th St

San Antonio, TX 78215

Defendant Attorneys

Brian M. Ercole

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Miami

5300 Wachovia Financial Center, 200 South Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

Bruno Reategui

Attorney at LEAD ATTORNEY

Melissa Marie Coates

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

200 S. Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

Steven A. Reed

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Valerie M. Toth

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Miami

5300 Wachovia Financial Center, 200 South Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

Timothy W. Knapp

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Zachary A. Ciullo

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Sherry A. Knutson

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Eliseo R Puig

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202-1370

Hannah Coleman

Attorney at LEAD ATTORNEY

Nathan E. Shafroth

Attorney at Covington & Burling - San Francisco

35Th Floor, One Front Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nicole Antoine

Attorney at LEAD ATTORNEY

Raymond Gin Lu

Attorney at Covington and Burling

Floor 52, 415 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Mary M Balaster

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002-6110

Neil A Hlawaatsch

Attorney at LEAD ATTORNEY

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1-State Court Docket

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Ex. A - State Court Summons and Complaint

6 #2

Ex. B - Magistrate Judge Consent Form

6 #3

Ex. C - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

#7

#8

#9

10 #10

Main Document

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • Docket(#37) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Eastern. Case number 2:21-cv-00751. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany L Van Roo on behalf of Hayward Pharmacy Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brittany L. Van Roo (Van Roo, Brittany) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Conor B O'Croinin on behalf of Roeschens Healthcare LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Conor B. O'Croinin (O'Croinin, Conor) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#34) ANSWER to Complaint by Laabs Inc.(Weiss, Monte) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#33) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation . (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#32) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Motz, Paul) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#31) Defenant Union Serv-U Pharmacy, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's the City of Greenfield First Amended Complaint by Union Serv-U Pharmacy Inc.(Motz, Paul) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket(#30) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/12/2021 re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by defendant Union Serv-U Pharmacy; #10 Defendant Roeschen's Healthcare, LLC's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for an Extension of Time to File its Responsive Pleading; #15 Expedited Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by defendant Hayward Pharmacy. The court GRANTS defendant Union Serv-U Pharmacy's motion for an extension of time and ORDERS that the time for Union Serv-U Pharmacy to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 14, 2021. The court GRANTS IN PART defendant Roeschen's Healthcare's motion for an extension of time and ORDERS that the time for Roeschen's Healthcare to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the objections to transfer to the MDL. The court DENIES AS MOOT defendant Hayward Pharmacy's motion for an extension of time; Hayward Pharmacy filed its answer on June 24, 2021, dkt. no. 18. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE by Roeschens Healthcare LLC re Status Regarding JPML Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - JPML Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Ex. B - Plaintiff's Notice of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Ex. C - JPML Order re Briefing Schedule)(Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docket(#28) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knutson, Sherry) [Transferred from wied on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATSON PHARMA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant