This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 09:37:55 (UTC).

City of Fairhope, Alabama v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 City of Fairhope, Alabama filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-OP-45002

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Fairhope, Alabama

Defendants

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC

Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Cardinal Health, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Miami-Luken, Inc.

WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. n/k/a HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Anda, Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keith Jackson

Attorney at Riley & Jackson

3530 Independence Drive

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Anda, Inc. waiver sent on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#10

(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/10/2022, answer due 4/11/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#11

(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 2/17/2022, answer due 4/18/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#12

(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#13

(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#14

(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#15

(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 2/17/2022, answer due 4/18/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/10/2022, answer due 4/11/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Anda, Inc. waiver sent on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11217276.. Filed by City of Fairhope, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jackson, Keith) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Miami-Luken, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant