This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2022 at 06:22:33 (UTC).

City of East St. Louis v. Netflix, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 City of East St Louis filed an Other - Communication lawsuit against Netflix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A. Beatty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00561

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Communication

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Beatty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of East St. Louis

Defendants

Peacock TV, LLC

Hulu, LLC

Netflix, Inc.

CuriosityStream, Inc.

Disney Streaming Services, LLC

Amazon.com Services, LLC

Apple Inc.

WarnerMedia Direct, LLC

CBS Interactive, Inc.

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles J Baricevic

Attorney at Chatham & Baricevic

107 West Main Street, Suite 1

Belleville, IL 62220

Zachary E Howerton

Attorney at Smouse & Mason, LLC

223 Duke Of Gloucester Street

Annapolis, MD 21401

John J. Driscoll

Attorney at Driscoll Firm, LLC

1311 Avenida Juan Ponce De Leon, 6Th Floor

San Juan, PR 00907

Defendant Attorneys

David P. Murray

Attorney at Willkie, Farr et al. - Washington

1875 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Matt D. Basil

Attorney at Willkie, Farr & Gallagher LLP - IL

300 North Lasalle Street, 50Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Matthew Wayne Johnson

Attorney at Willkie, Farr et al. - Washington

1875 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Kelly H. Yin

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2027

Darci F. Madden

Attorney at Bryan Cave - St. Louis

211 North Broadway

Naomi R. Strauss

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini, et al. - Palo Alto

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Victor Jih

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2027

Russell L. Kostelak

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2027

Jordan Joachim

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP -New York

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Mitchell Aaron Kamin

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP - CA

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Mary Rose Alexander

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - Chicago

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Jared R. Butcher

Attorney at Berliner Corcoran & Rowe LLP

1101 Seventeenth Street Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Jeffrey L. Schultz

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP - St. Louis

7700 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Kathleen A. Stetsko

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP - Chicago

110 North Wacker Dr., Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer Aronoff

Attorney at McDermott, Will, et al. - Chicago

444 West Lake Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60606-0029

Dawn M. Peacock

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery, LLP

444 West Lake Street, Ste 4000

Chicago, IL 60606

Christopher MacNeil Murphy

444 West Lake Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60606-0029

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#207

(#207) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#206

(#206) ORDER GRANTING #172 , #173 , #174 , #176 , and #178 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 167) is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#200

(#200) MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by Disney Platform Distribution, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

197 #197

Main Document

#178

(#206) ORDER GRANTING #172 , #173 , #174 , #176 , and #178 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 167) is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#176

(#206) ORDER GRANTING #172 , #173 , #174 , #176 , and #178 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 167) is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#174

(#206) ORDER GRANTING #172 , #173 , #174 , #176 , and #178 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 167) is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#173

(#206) ORDER GRANTING #172 , #173 , #174 , #176 , and #178 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 167) is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#172

(#206) ORDER GRANTING #172 , #173 , #174 , #176 , and #178 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 167) is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#206) ORDER GRANTING #172 , #173 , #174 , #176 , and #178 Motions to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 167) is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/23/2022. (klh2) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#205) ORDER GRANTING #197 and #200 Motions for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. The Court accepts the Notices of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants (Docs. 197-1, 197-2, 201, 201-1), as well as the responses filed by Plaintiff (Docs. 199, 204), and will consider them as necessary in the forthcoming ruling on the motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/20/2022. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) RESPONSE in Opposition re #200 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by City of East St. Louis. (Howerton, Zachary) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) NOTICE OF ACTION re #201 Notice (Other) filed by Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc., Disney Platform Distribution, Inc. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#202) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #200 Motion for Leave to File filed by Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc., Disney Platform Distribution, Inc. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#201) NOTICE by Disney Platform Distribution, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc. re #200 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#200) MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by Disney Platform Distribution, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Netflix, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#199) RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by City of East St. Louis. (Howerton, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#198) ORDER GRANTING #196 Motion for Leave to Withdraw. Attorney Christopher M. Murphy is terminated as counsel for Defendant Apple Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/26/2022. (jmp2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Requested. (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Requested. (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Requested. (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Requested. (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Requested. (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Requested. (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Requested. (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: City of East St. Louis. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-561-MAB. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/1/2021. (kls3) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Baricevic on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4499307.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baricevic, Charles) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Disney Streaming Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Curiositystream Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Peacock TV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CBS INTERACTIVE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant