This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:37:04 (UTC).

City of Cullman, Alabama v. Cullman Electric Cooperative

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 City of Cullman, Alabama filed an Other lawsuit against Cullman Electric Cooperative. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Liles C Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01482

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liles C Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Cullman, Alabama

Defendant

Cullman Electric Cooperative

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J Canupp

Roy W Williams, Jr

Andrew Thomas Toler

Defendant Attorneys

Richard R Raleigh, Jr

Christopher Lea Lockwood

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Exhibit Judge Smith's Decision

14 #1

Exhibit 1991 Declaratory Judgment

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cullman Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1991 Declaratory Judgment, #2 Exhibit Judge Smith's Decision)(Raleigh, Richard) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/22/21. (BJL) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER: Cullman Electric Cooperative shall respond to the City of Cullman, Alabama's motion to remand. The parties shall not submit any additional briefing on the motions currently pending in this case. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/16/21. (BJL) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed) filed by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed) by Cullman Electric Cooperative. (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#8

(#8) Brief re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/29/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy W Williams, Jr on behalf of City of Cullman, Alabama (Williams, Roy) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:21-cv-1482-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Cullman Electric Cooperative. (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cullman Electric Cooperative from The Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-CV-2021-900278. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BJL) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cullman Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1991 Declaratory Judgment, #2 Exhibit Judge Smith's Decision)(Raleigh, Richard) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/22/21. (BJL) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Cullman Electric Cooperative shall respond to the City of Cullman, Alabama's motion to remand. The parties shall not submit any additional briefing on the motions currently pending in this case. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/16/21. (BJL) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed) filed by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed) by Cullman Electric Cooperative. (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Cullman, Alabama. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/29/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy W Williams, Jr on behalf of City of Cullman, Alabama (Williams, Roy) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:21-cv-1482-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Cullman Electric Cooperative. (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3957448 (B460116806). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cullman Electric Cooperative from The Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-CV-2021-900278. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(BJL). (Raleigh, Richard) Modified on 11/8/2021 (BJL). (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cullman Electric Cooperative from The Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-CV-2021-900278. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BJL) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less