This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 11:11:36 (UTC).

City of Cullman, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 City of Cullman, Alabama filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45248

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Cullman, Alabama

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cephalon Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Mallinckrodt PLC

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Archie Cleveland Lamb, Jr.

Peter James Mougey

Laura Sherling Dunning

Page Anderson Poerschke

Roy W. Williams, Jr.

Paul T. Farrell, Jr.

Gaynor L. St. John

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

 

Docket Entries

05/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Farrell, Jr filed by on behalf of City of Cullman, Alabama. (Farrell, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 5:19-cv-00444. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/16/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern Ohio for inclusion in MDL #2804; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Northern Ohio. (BJL) [Transferred from alnd on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 04/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3301124 (receipt number B4601096116). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc filed by City of Cullman, Alabama.(BJL). (Mougey, Peter) Modified on 3/15/2019 (BJL). [Transferred from alnd on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) [Transferred from alnd on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc filed by City of Cullman, Alabama.(BJL) [Transferred from alnd on 4/16/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less