Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 09:03:28 (UTC).

City of Costa Mesa et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 City of Costa Mesa filed an Other lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02320

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Costa Mesa

Defendants

Beverly Sackler

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Richard S. Sackler

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Allergan, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Actavis PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Theresa Sackler

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Allergan plc

Cardinal Health, Inc.

David A. Sackler

Irene Sackler Lefcourt

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Geibelson

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3208

Kimberly Hall Barlow

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney for Costa Mesa

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

Bernice Conn

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Plaza East, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3283

Lucas Andrew Messenger

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Roman M. Silberfeld

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3211

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Elizabeth Neglia

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rebecca Grace Van Tassell

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Nathan E. Shafroth

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission St

San Francisco, CA 94105

Raymond Gin Lu

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

Michiyo Michelle Burkart

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, #1700

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by California Attorney General's Office (Burkart, Michiyo) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#21

(#21) Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE #10 MOTION to Remand by City of Costa Mesa, The People of the State of California (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

17 #5

Exhibit 4

#17

(#17) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 5/23/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth in support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Neglia on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc. (Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/3/2019) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by McKesson Corporation of re #1 Notice of Removal (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/1/2019) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#29

(#22) ORDER STAYING ACTIONS PENDING JPML ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02307-JST, 3:19-cv-02320-JST, 3:19-cv-02321-JST, 3:19-cv-02323-JST, 3:19-cv-02324-JST, 3:19-cv-02325-JST, 3:19-cv-02326-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#19

(#20) ORDER RELATING CASE 19-cv-2307-JST to 19-cv-02320-PJH,19-cv-02321-JD,19-cv-02323-RS,19-cv-02324-JST, 19-cv-02325-JD, 19-cv-02326-JSW. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#2

(#2) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Person filed by McKesson Corporation (Van Tassell, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by McKesson Corporation of re #1 Notice of Removal (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/1/2019) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Related Cases filed by California Attorney General's Office (Burkart, Michiyo) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER STAYING ACTIONS PENDING JPML ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02307-JST, 3:19-cv-02320-JST, 3:19-cv-02321-JST, 3:19-cv-02323-JST, 3:19-cv-02324-JST, 3:19-cv-02325-JST, 3:19-cv-02326-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER RELATING CASE 19-cv-2307-JST to 19-cv-02320-PJH,19-cv-02321-JD,19-cv-02323-RS,19-cv-02324-JST, 19-cv-02325-JD, 19-cv-02326-JSW. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE #10 MOTION to Remand by City of Costa Mesa, The People of the State of California (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 5/23/2019. Replies due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth in support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Submission Regarding Removed Case by McKesson Corporation (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/9/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #8 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by City of Costa Mesa, The People of the State of California. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Costa Mesa, The People of the State of California.. (Messenger, Lucas) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION)(Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Elizabeth Neglia on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc. (Neglia, Ashley) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/3/2019) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by McKesson Corporation of re #1 Notice of Removal (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/1/2019) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Person filed by McKesson Corporation (Van Tassell, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their Case Number is CGC19574865, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13301344). Filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Tassell, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 5/2/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Allergan PLC is a litigant