This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 11:08:59 (UTC).

City of Corpus Christi v. J.S. Haren Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 City of Corpus Christi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against J S Haren Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Drew B Tipton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Drew B Tipton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

City of Corpus Christi

Defendants and Counter Claimants

J.S. Haren Company

Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey J Lehrman

Attorney at Anderson Lehrman Barre Maraist LLP

1001 Third Street, Ste 1

Corpus Christi, TX 78404

Andrew W Schuster

Attorney at Anderson, Lehrman, Barre and Maraist LLP

1001 Third St., Suite 1, Ste 1

Corpus Christi, TX 78404

Donald Warren Elliott, Jr.

Attorney at Anderson, Lehrman, Barre & Maraist, LLP

1001 Third St., Suite. 1

Corpus Christi, TX 78404

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lauren Alexandra Beverly

Attorney at KIane Russell

5051 Weshheimer Rd, Ste 1000

Houston, TX 77056

David Royce Thrasher

Attorney at Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC

5051 Westheimer Road, 10Th Floor

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), filed.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2022. Motion to Add New Parties due by 6/10/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/10/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2022. Discovery due by 9/16/2022. Mediation due by 9/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2023. Docket Call set for 1/12/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(amireles, 2) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/3/2022 at 03:30 PM in by video before Judge Drew B Tipton, filed. All Parties to Appear by Zoom. Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1619592474?pwd=M0prQ2cxelM4M2JiY0NKSjFERFJHZz09Meeting ID: 161 959 2474 Passcode: 922233Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 646 828 7666 US (New York)Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. (KelliePapaioannouadi, 2) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#8

(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), filed.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) COUNTERCLAIM against City of Corpus Christi filed by J.S. Haren Company.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Service in Removed Action and Statement of Information by J.S. Haren Company, filed.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(NeldaGarcia, 2) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County at Law 3, case number 2021ccv-61178-3 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27252183) filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), J.S. Haren Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), filed.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2022. Motion to Add New Parties due by 6/10/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/10/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2022. Discovery due by 9/16/2022. Mediation due by 9/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/5/2023. Docket Call set for 1/12/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(amireles, 2) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Drew B Tipton. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/3/2022. Status of case and deadlines discussed. Parties agree this will be a BENCH TRIAL. Scheduling Order to be entered. Appearances: Donald Warren Elliott, Jr, David Royce Thrasher.(Digital # 3:27-3:47)(ERO:Nelda Garcia), filed.(KelliePapaioannou, 2) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/3/2022 at 03:30 PM in by video before Judge Drew B Tipton, filed. All Parties to Appear by Zoom. Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1619592474?pwd=M0prQ2cxelM4M2JiY0NKSjFERFJHZz09Meeting ID: 161 959 2474 Passcode: 922233Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 646 828 7666 US (New York)Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. (KelliePapaioannouadi, 2) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J.S. Haren Company, Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), filed.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim by City of Corpus Christi, filed.(Lehrman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COUNTERCLAIM against City of Corpus Christi filed by J.S. Haren Company.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Service in Removed Action and Statement of Information by J.S. Haren Company, filed.(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(NeldaGarcia, 2) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County at Law 3, case number 2021ccv-61178-3 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27252183) filed by Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), J.S. Haren Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thrasher, David) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J. S. Haren Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Royce Thrasher