This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:25:19 (UTC).

City of Buffalo v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 City of Buffalo filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-46104

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Walgreen Co

Raymond Sackler Family

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Ortho McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Smith Drug Company

Discount Drug Mart, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Wal-Mart Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

HBC Service Company

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Emma Sanh Nguyen

Attorney at Covington & Burling - New York

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Michael T Ferruggia

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Michael T. Ferruggia

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Other Attorneys

Shayna Erin Sacks

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik - Melville

400 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

Luke A Connelly

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Hunter J. Shkolnik

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik - Melville

400 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

Joseph J. Ciaccio

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC

400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305

Melville, NY 11747

Salvatore C. Badala

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik - Melville

400 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

Phoebe Anne Wilkinson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Paul J. Napoli

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik

11Th Floor, 360 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Luke A. Connelly

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Joseph L. Ciaccio

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik - Melville

400 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.

Attorney at Wiener, Weiss & Madison

330 Marshall Street

Shreveport, LA 71101

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Defendant HBC Service Company filed by City of Buffalo. (Badala, Salvatore) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

23 #1

Exhibit Proof of Service

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Morris & Dickson Holding Co., L.L.C. for Morris & Dickson Co LLC filed by Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Spruiell, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

22 #1

Exhibit Proof of Service

#22

(#22) Attorney Appearance by Frank H. Spruiell, Jr filed by on behalf of Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Spruiell, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#21

(#21) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Publix Supermarkets, Inc. filed by City of Buffalo. (Badala, Salvatore) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#20

(#20) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Defendant Discount Drug Mart, Inc. filed by City of Buffalo. (Shkolnik, Hunter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

19 #1

*Restricted*

#19

(#19) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Western. Case number 1:19-cv-01517. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit F - Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing

1 #7

Exhibit E - Affidavit

1 #6

Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance

1 #5

Exhibit C - No Fee Authorization Letter

1 #4

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit A - Summons

1 #2

State court action Index

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. from New York Supreme Court, County of Erie, case number 811359/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3646923), filed by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State court action Index, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - No Fee Authorization Letter, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance, #7 Exhibit E - Affidavit, #8 Exhibit F - Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing)(Connelly, Luke) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Defendant HBC Service Company filed by City of Buffalo. (Badala, Salvatore) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Morris & Dickson Holding Co., L.L.C. for Morris & Dickson Co LLC filed by Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Spruiell, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Attorney Appearance by Frank H. Spruiell, Jr filed by on behalf of Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Spruiell, Frank) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Publix Supermarkets, Inc. filed by City of Buffalo. (Badala, Salvatore) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) against Defendant Discount Drug Mart, Inc. filed by City of Buffalo. (Shkolnik, Hunter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Western. Case number 1:19-cv-01517. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 12/3/2019. (CGJ) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Value Drug Company. (Graney, Charles) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Nguyen, Emma) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Sanh Nguyen on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Nguyen, Emma) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc... (Herman, Brian) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreen, Co. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co., Walgreen, Co... (Reed, Michael) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 30 days following: (1) the Court's decision on any motion to remand; or (2) a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on transfer of this action to the opioid-related multidistrict litigation, whichever is later. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/15/2019. (CDH). [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, on behalf of Defendants, by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connelly, Luke) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp... (Connelly, Luke) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. from New York Supreme Court, County of Erie, case number 811359/2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3646923), filed by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State court action Index, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - No Fee Authorization Letter, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance, #7 Exhibit E - Affidavit, #8 Exhibit F - Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing)(Connelly, Luke) [Transferred from nywd on 12/5/2019.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.