This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 08:54:00 (UTC).

City of Bay Minette, Alabama et al v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 City of Bay Minette, Alabama filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-OP-45018

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Bay Minette, Alabama

Town of Loxley, Alabama

Town of Summerdale, Alabama

Defendants

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Cardinal Health, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.

Noramco, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Actavis LLC

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Bradley Ponder

Attorney at Montgomery Ponder

2226 First Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35233

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/30/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/30/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/30/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., pro tanto, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#11

(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#12

(#12) Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) CVS Health Corporation, Walgreen Co. Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, J.M. Smith Corporation, Harco, Inc. f/k/a Harco Drug, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Walmart Inc., Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. Filed by Town of Loxley, Alabama, City of Bay Minette, Alabama, Town of Summerdale, Alabama. (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#13

(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#14

(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#15

(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. J.M. Smith Corporation waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. J.M. Smith Corporation waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2022, answer due 7/8/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) CVS Health Corporation, Walgreen Co. Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, J.M. Smith Corporation, Harco, Inc. f/k/a Harco Drug, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Walmart Inc., Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. Filed by Town of Loxley, Alabama, City of Bay Minette, Alabama, Town of Summerdale, Alabama. (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., pro tanto, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/30/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/30/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2022, answer due 5/30/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11333177. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-2804. Filed by Town of Loxley, Alabama, City of Bay Minette, Alabama, Town of Summerdale, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ponder, J.) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Noramco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant