This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 07:20:10 (UTC).

City Merchandise Inc. v. Tian Tian Trading Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 City Merchandise Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tian Tian Trading Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09649

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Merchandise Inc.

Defendants

Weiwei Lin

Tian Tian Trading Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward G. Toptani

Attorney at Toptani Law Offices

127 East 59Th Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorney

Curt Donald Schmidt

Attorney at The Law Office of Curt Donald Schmidt

39 East Broadway Suite 405, Suite 405

New York, NY 10002

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 4/13/2020. The case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2019. Deposition due by 2/4/2020. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Motions due by 2/28/2020. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Replies due by 3/23/2020. Oral Argument set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/20/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #8 Complaint. Document filed by Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc..(Schmidt, Curt) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#19

(#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc..(Schmidt, Curt) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Donald Schmidt on behalf of Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc.. (Schmidt, Curt) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward G. Toptani on behalf of City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Weiwei Lin served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane" Lin. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Tian Tian Trading Inc. served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane" Lin. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit Ex.B-Copyright

8 #1

Exhibit Ex.A-CMI NYC Design Products

#8

(#20) ANSWER to #8 Complaint. Document filed by Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc..(Schmidt, Curt) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc..(Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit NY Baseball Design Products

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Edward G. Toptani to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 4/13/2020. The case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2019. Deposition due by 2/4/2020. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Motions due by 2/28/2020. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Replies due by 3/23/2020. Oral Argument set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/20/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2019, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to #8 Complaint. Document filed by Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc..(Schmidt, Curt) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc..(Schmidt, Curt) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Donald Schmidt on behalf of Weiwei Lin, Tian Tian Trading Inc.. (Schmidt, Curt) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 11/5/2019, ( Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward G. Toptani on behalf of City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Weiwei Lin served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane" Lin. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Tian Tian Trading Inc. served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by "Jane" Lin. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Weiwei Lin. (dnh) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Edward G. Toptani to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by City Merchandise Inc..(Toptani, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17797236)Document filed by City Merchandise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Baseball Design Products, #2 Exhibit)(Toptani, Edward) Modified on 10/21/2019 (pne). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.