This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 00:00:48 (UTC).

City Gear LLC v. Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 City Gear LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna M Manasco. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00459

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna M Manasco

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City Gear LLC

Defendants

Zion Rootswear LLC

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brooke Raylynn Watson

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN, LLP

420 20Th Street North, Ste. 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Ellen T Mathews

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

Howell Griffith O'Rear

Attorney at MCINTEER & O'REAR PLC

2209 Crestmoor Rd., Ste. 310

Nashville, TN 37215

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC Notice of Change of Address for McInteer and O'Rear PLC (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

19 #1

Exhibit 1 Chart of Correspondence Filed by Plaintiff

19 #19

Main Document

18 #3

Exhibit 3

18 #2

Exhibit 2

18 #1

Exhibit 1

18 #18

Main Document

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

11 #2

Exhibit Spreadsheet of Zion Trademark Lawsuits

11 #1

Exhibit Spreadsheet of Bravado Trademark Lawsuits

11 #11

Main Document

#9

(#13) TEXT ORDER: Before the court is defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ). In light of plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. #11 ), the Motion to Dismiss is not directed at the operative complaint. Accordingly, the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ) is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/2/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#6

#4

#2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC Notice of Change of Address for McInteer and O'Rear PLC (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Chart of Correspondence Filed by Plaintiff)(O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by City Gear LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mathews, Ellen) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. #16 ). Plaintiff City Gear's response is due within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order; Defendants' reply is due within fourteen (14) days of the date plaintiff's response is filed. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/25/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Law in Support of Dismissing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #14 . Defendant's answer to the amended complaint is now due by August 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/6/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER: Before the court is defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ). In light of plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. #11 ), the Motion to Dismiss is not directed at the operative complaint. Accordingly, the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ) is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/2/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by City Gear LLC. filed by City Gear LLC (Mathews, Ellen) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants, filed by City Gear LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet of Bravado Trademark Lawsuits, #2 Exhibit Spreadsheet of Zion Trademark Lawsuits)(Mathews, Ellen) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER. Status Conference set for Thursday, May 27, 2021 at 01:00 PM by Zoom before Judge Anna M Manasco. The court will provide the zoom information to the parties by email. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 5/24/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Third MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc answer due 6/7/2021; Zion Rootswear LLC answer due 6/7/2021. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Doc. #4 is GRANTED. Based on good cause shown, Defendants are GRANTED until June 7, 2021 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/26/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint [Doc. #2 ] is GRANTED. Based on good cause shown, Defendants are GRANTED a 30-day extension to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/2/21. (MRR, ) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC. (O'Rear, Howell) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (MRR, ). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3808585 (B4601112344). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2021-900551., filed by Zion Rootswear LLC, Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(MRR, ). (O'Rear, Howell) Modified on 3/31/2021 (MRR, ). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc, Zion Rootswear LLC, filed by City Gear LLC.-Deemed filed 2/19/21, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p.7 combined pdf)(MRR, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2021-900551., filed by Zion Rootswear LLC, Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MRR, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zion Rootswear LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellen T. Mathews