This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 07:50:07 (UTC).

Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Citizens Insurance Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is John E. Jones, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01797

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E. Jones, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citizens Insurance Company of America

Defendants

James Yeatts

Peter S. Higgins and Associates

Ridgurak, Inc.

National Distribution Centers, LLC

Peter Higgins, P.E.

GMSS Installers, Inc.

Pengate Handling Systems, Inc.

Yeatts Consultant

Jim Yeats

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole M. Ehrhart

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Colemand & Goggin

100 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 201

Camp Hill, PA 17011

Defendant Attorneys

John J. Delany

Attorney at Delany McBride

1500 Jfik Boulevard, Suite 410

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Andrew P. Campbell

Attorney at Delany McBride

Two Penn Center, 1500 Jfk Blvd., Suite 410,

Philadelphia, PA 19102

William J. Ricci

Attorney at Ricci Tyrrell Johnson & Grey PLLC

1515 Market Street, Suite 700

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. James Yeatts served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019; Yeatts Consultant served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019. (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Citizens Insurance Company of America. GMSS Installers, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER The joint case management plans in these cases SHALL BE FILED by orbefore December 19, 2019. (eo) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#14

(#14) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to John J. Delany III (eo) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#13

(#13) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John J. Delany on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. Attorney John Delany is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4929709., filed by on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc..(Delany, John) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#12

(#12) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William J. Ricci (eo) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#11

(#11) Supplement by Pengate Handling Systems, Inc.. to #8 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Signed Code of Professional Conduct. (Ricci, William) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Delany on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. (Delany, John) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#8

(#11) Supplement by Pengate Handling Systems, Inc.. to #8 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Signed Code of Professional Conduct. (Ricci, William) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

2 #6

B

2 #5

A-5

2 #4

A-4

2 #3

A-3

2 #2

A-2

2 #1

A-1

#2

(#2) EXHIBITS filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 A-1, #2 A-2, #3 A-3, #4 A-4, #5 A-5, #6 B)(aaa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4900333), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) Modified on 10/16/2019 (aaa). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. James Yeatts served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019; Yeatts Consultant served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019. (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Citizens Insurance Company of America. GMSS Installers, Inc. waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER The joint case management plans in these cases SHALL BE FILED by orbefore December 19, 2019. (eo) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to John J. Delany III (eo) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John J. Delany on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. Attorney John Delany is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4929709., filed by on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc..(Delany, John) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to William J. Ricci (eo) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petition #8 for Special Admission, Petitioner and associate counsel bar status verified. (rw) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Supplement by Pengate Handling Systems, Inc.. to #8 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Signed Code of Professional Conduct. (Ricci, William) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Delany on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. (Delany, John) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Campbell on behalf of Ridgurak, Inc. (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a Supplement to Document 8. Signed Code of Professional Conduct needs submitted. (aaa) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by William J. Ricci on behalf of Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. Attorney William Ricci is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4925423.. (Ricci, William) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Ricci on behalf of Pengate Handling Systems, Inc. (Ricci, William) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2019 11:15 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar. The 4 dates attibuted to each trial term must be utilized when completing the JCMP.(eo) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Citizens Insurance Company of America. National Distribution Centers, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Ehrhart, Nicole) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXHIBITS filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 A-1, #2 A-2, #3 A-3, #4 A-4, #5 A-5, #6 B)(aaa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4900333), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) Modified on 10/16/2019 (aaa). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.