This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 10:15:26 (UTC).

Cisneros et al v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Cisneros filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01220

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Santiago Cisneros, Jr.

Isaac Cisneros

Maria Cisneros

Juan Luis Cisneros

Jose Miguel Mendoza

Francisco Javier Cisneros

Krystal Mendoza

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Walmart Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC d/b/a Wal-Mart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lena Bianca Laurenzo

Attorney at Abraham Watkins et al

800 Commerce Street

Houston, TX 77002

Muhammad S. Aziz

Attorney at Abraham, Watkins, Nichols, Sorrels, Agosto & Friend

800 Commerce Street

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Weston Lee O'Black

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Alejandra C. Salinas

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2020. Pltf Expert Report due by 3/27/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 4/27/2020. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Mediation due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/26/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2020. Docket Call set for 8/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed. (Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed. (Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. (O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#13

(#13) AMENDED ANSWER to by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. (O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#12

(#12) Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order & Docket Control Order, filed.(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#10

(#10) Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Re: #9 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed.(Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed.(Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed.(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

4 #1

Supplement

#4

(#4) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

3 #4

Exhibit D, All Counsel of Record

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2020. Pltf Expert Report due by 3/27/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 4/27/2020. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Mediation due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/26/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2020. Docket Call set for 8/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docket(#17) Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference hearing held on May 29, 2019. The court will enter a separate scheduling order, as stated on the record. Appearances: Lena Laurenzo/Clay Long for Pltfs. and Weston O'Black/Alejandra Salinas for Defts.(Court Reporter: G. Dye), filed.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed. (Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed. (Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. (O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED ANSWER to by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. (O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order & Docket Control Order, filed.(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Re: #9 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed.(Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Francisco Javier Cisneros, Isaac Cisneros, Juan Luis Cisneros, Maria Cisneros, Santiago Cisneros, Jr, Jose Miguel Mendoza, Krystal Mendoza, filed.(Aziz, Muhammad) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed.(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B, Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C, Index of Matters Being Filed, #4 Exhibit D, All Counsel of Record, #5 Exhibit E, Process Served)(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc., filed.(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-22356 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22175927) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh A, All State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exh B, State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exh C, Index of Matters Being Filed, #5 Exhibit Exh D, All Counsel of Record)(O'Black, Weston) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weston Lee O'Black

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alejandra C. Salinas