This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:20:26 (UTC).

Cisneros et al v. Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Cisneros filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11152

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noe Soriano Cisneros

Defendant

Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Hans Cooper

Attorney at Cilenti & Cooper, PLLC

10 Grand Central, 155 East 44Th Street, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc. served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Legal Clerk, New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of himself). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of himself), Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of other similarly situated employees). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18219427)Document filed by Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of himself), Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of other similarly situated employees).(Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc. served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Legal Clerk, New York Secretary of State. Document filed by Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of himself). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (jgo) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of himself), Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of other similarly situated employees). (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Las Sirenas Restaurant Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18219427)Document filed by Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of himself), Noe Soriano Cisneros(on behalf of other similarly situated employees).(Cooper, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.