This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 11:05:22 (UTC).

Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Dexon Computer, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Cisco Systems, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Dexon Computer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Hixson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04926

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Hixson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cisco Systems, Inc.

Cisco Technology, Inc.

Defendant

Dexon Computer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angela M He

Attorney at Sideman & Bancroft, LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Louis P. Feuchtbaum

Attorney at Sideman & Bancroft

One Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94131

Richard Joseph Nelson

Attorney at Sideman & Bancroft LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Artur A. Minasyan

Attorney at Sideman & Bankcroft LLP

One Embarcadero Center, Twenty-Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. Service waived by Dexon Computer, Inc. waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Feuchtbaum, Louis) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

8 #1

complaint

#8

(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Dexon Computer, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc... (Minasyan, Artur) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (He, Angela) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cisco Systems, Inc. for Cisco Technology, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Feuchtbaum, Louis) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Dexon Computer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14722735.). Filed byCisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. Service waived by Dexon Computer, Inc. waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Feuchtbaum, Louis) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Dexon Computer, Inc.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc... (Minasyan, Artur) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (He, Angela) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cisco Systems, Inc. for Cisco Technology, Inc.. and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Feuchtbaum, Louis) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Dexon Computer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14722735.). Filed byCisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Richard) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less