This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2022 at 07:34:48 (UTC).

Angel Cirilo v. Universal City Studios LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Angel Cirilo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Universal City Studios LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03249

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Cirilo

Defendants

Universal City Studios LLC

Doe

Does 2 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel D Geoulla

Attorney at B and D Law Group APLC

10700 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Khushboo Balani Vasandani

Attorney at B and D Law Group., APLC

10700 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Babak Kheiri

Attorney at B and D Law Group APLC

10700 Santa Monica Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Jaion Chung

Attorney at Poole Shaffery

25350 Magic Mountain Parkway Suite 250

Valencia, CA 91355

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10, filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC.. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#15

(#15) SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #13 filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC.(Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#13

(#13) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33454863 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo.(Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#12

(#12) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo, (Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#11

(#11) DEMAND for Jury Trial Angel Cirilo.. (Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Babak Kheiri counsel for Plaintiff Angel Cirilo. Adding Babak Kheiri as counsel of record for Angel Cirilo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo. (Attorney Babak Kheiri added to party Angel Cirilo(pty:pla))(Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2022, at 9:00 AM. (jre) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

1 #10

Exhibit EX. H - ANSWER

1 #8

Exhibit EX. F - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1 #7

Exhibit EX. E - AMENDMENT

1 #6

Exhibit EX. D - PROOF OF SERVICE UNIVERSAL STUDIOS

1 #5

Exhibit EX. C - PROOF OF SERVICE NBCUNIVERSAL THEME PARK

1 #4

Exhibit EX. B - PROOF OF SERVICE NBCUNIVERSAL, LLC

1 #2

Declaration DECLARATION OF GABRIELA KORNZWEIG IN SUPPORT OF DEFE1\1DANT UNI

1 #1

Declaration DECLARATION OF JAION CHUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL CITY ST

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10, filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC.. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #13 filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC.(Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33454863 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo.(Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo, (Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEMAND for Jury Trial Angel Cirilo.. (Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Babak Kheiri counsel for Plaintiff Angel Cirilo. Adding Babak Kheiri as counsel of record for Angel Cirilo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo. (Attorney Babak Kheiri added to party Angel Cirilo(pty:pla))(Kheiri, Babak) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2022 is hereby CONTINUED to 7/18/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report is due one or before 7/11/2022. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2022, at 9:00 AM. (jre) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo, upon Defendant Universal City Studios LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/13/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court, rules 3.760 and 3.770. as to Comcast Corporation, NBCUniversal Theme Park, NBCUniversal, LLC, Universal Studios. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/13/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Universal City Studios LLC, filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/1/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(Attorney Khushboo B. Vasandani added to party Angel Cirilo(pty:pla))(lh) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo, upon Defendant Universal Studios served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beth Burn, Corporate Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/7/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo, upon Defendant NBCUniversal Theme Park served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, CT Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/07/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo, upon Defendant NBCUniversal, LLC served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, CT Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/7/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Comcast Corporation, Does, NBCUniversal Theme Park, NBCUniversal, LLC, Universal Studios, filed by Plaintiff Angel Cirilo. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/22/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC [L.R.7.1-1] re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 208T0V36095 Receipt No: ACACDC-33290254 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Universal City Studios LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JAION CHUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLCS NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF GABRIELA KORNZWEIG IN SUPPORT OF DEFE1\1DANT UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #3 Exhibit EX. A - COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, STATEMENT OF DAMAGES, #4 Exhibit EX. B - PROOF OF SERVICE NBCUNIVERSAL, LLC, #5 Exhibit EX. C - PROOF OF SERVICE NBCUNIVERSAL THEME PARK, #6 Exhibit EX. D - PROOF OF SERVICE UNIVERSAL STUDIOS, #7 Exhibit EX. E - AMENDMENT, #8 Exhibit EX. F - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, #9 Exhibit EX. G - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT - CIVIL, #10 Exhibit EX. H - ANSWER) (Attorney Jaion Chung added to party Universal City Studios LLC(pty:dft))(Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal City Studios Inc is a litigant