This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 09:16:04 (UTC).

Circa 1200, LLC v. Louis Angel et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Circa 1200, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Louis Angel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02848

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Circa 1200, LLC

Defendants

Does 1 to 10 inclusive

Louis Angel

Los Angeles, CA 90015

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Linda Tracey Hollenbeck

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

7755 Center Ave., Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Tania Kim Cardoso

Attorney at Law Offices of Hollenbeck & Cardoso, LLP

7755 Center Avenue, Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California Los Angeles County. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California Los Angeles County. (lom) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lom) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Parma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED (see comments above). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (lom) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by defendant Louis Angel. (esa) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendant Louis Angel. (esa) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Cout of California, Los Angeles County, case number 21STUD00259 with copies of summons and complaint (p.5). Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, discovery to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, filed by defendant Louis Angel. (Attachments: #1 CV 71) (esa) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCA 1200 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tania Kim Cardoso

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Linda Tracey Hollenbeck