This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:39:51 (UTC).

Cira v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Cira filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C Dries and Brett H Ludwig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen C Dries

Brett H Ludwig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl Cira

Oak Creek, WI 53154

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel C Gold

Attorney at Samuel C Gold Esq

1100 Brickell Bay Dr - Ste 66M

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer L Bullard

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

Po Box 26370

Minneapolis, MN 55426

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) BRIEF in Support filed by Boston Scientific Corporation re #14 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . (Bullard, Jennifer)

#14

(#14) Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bullard, Jennifer)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT First with Jury Demand against Boston Scientific Corporation filed by Carl Cira.(Gold, Samuel)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Gold on behalf of Carl Cira. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C Gold (Gold, Samuel)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer L Bullard and of Law Firm Affiliation of Counsel (Bullard, Jennifer)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 2/9/2022 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss due 3/2/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(kmm)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time filed by plaintiff Carl Cira (vkb)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mailing and Emailing Removal documents to Plaintiff (Bullard, Jennifer)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bullard, Jennifer)

#3

(#3) BRIEF in Support filed by Boston Scientific Corporation re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Bullard, Jennifer)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bullard, Jennifer)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Removal Notice State Court Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEF in Support filed by Boston Scientific Corporation re #14 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT First with Jury Demand against Boston Scientific Corporation filed by Carl Cira.(Gold, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Gold on behalf of Carl Cira. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C Gold (Gold, Samuel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer L Bullard and of Law Firm Affiliation of Counsel (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 2/9/2022 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss due 3/2/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(kmm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time filed by plaintiff Carl Cira (vkb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Carl Cira. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation of Mailing and Emailing Removal documents to Plaintiff (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEF in Support filed by Boston Scientific Corporation re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boston Scientific Corporation from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 12-cv-006240 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4021592) (Attachments: #1 Removal Notice State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bullard, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Leigh Bullard