This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2020 at 10:09:19 (UTC).

Cioffi v. Ingram et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Cioffi filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ingram. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Jo Cioffi

Kinston, NC 28501

Defendants

Donna Stroud

Ronnie T. Ingram

Dawn Stroud

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Frederick Hughes Bailey, III

Attorney at Sumrell Sugg

416 Pollock Street

New Bern, NC 28560

Scott C. Hart

Attorney at Sumrell Sugg

416 Pollock Street

New Bern, NC 28560

Elizabeth Curran O'Brien

Attorney at NC Department of Justice

Post Office Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#25

(#25) Rule 12 Letter Issued to Pro Se Plaintiff as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer. Responses due by 11/30/2020. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#24

(#24) Memorandum in Support regarding #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer filed by Ronnie T. Ingram. (Hart, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#23

(#23) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer filed by Ronnie T. Ingram. (Hart, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#22

(#22) Affidavit of Process: Confirmation not received as to Dawn Stroud filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#21

(#21) Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Amy Jo Cioffi served on Ronnie T. Ingram on 10/2/20. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#20

(#20) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #5 Amended Complaint filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#18) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #5 Amended Complaint. Dawn Stroud answer due 11/30/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/13/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Amy Jo Cioffi, 1202 Barbara Lane, Kinston, NC 28501.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Ronnie T. Ingram, Dawn Stroud. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons filed by Amy Jo Cioffi served on Ronnie T. Ingram and Donna Stroud on 9/24/2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#5

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #5 Amended Complaint. Ronnie T. Ingram answer due 11/16/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/13/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Amy Jo Cioffi, 1202 Barbara Lane, Kinston, NC 28501.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Ronnie T. Ingram, Donna Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Summons) Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ronnie T. Ingram, Donna Stroud (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number GRN002601), filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Rule 12 Letter Issued to Pro Se Plaintiff as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer. Responses due by 11/30/2020. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Memorandum in Support regarding #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer filed by Ronnie T. Ingram. (Hart, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Lieu of An Answer filed by Ronnie T. Ingram. (Hart, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Affidavit of Process: Confirmation not received as to Dawn Stroud filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Amy Jo Cioffi served on Ronnie T. Ingram on 10/2/20. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #5 Amended Complaint filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to Motion regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #5 Amended Complaint filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #5 Amended Complaint. Dawn Stroud answer due 11/30/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/13/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Amy Jo Cioffi, 1202 Barbara Lane, Kinston, NC 28501.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #5 Amended Complaint. Ronnie T. Ingram answer due 11/16/2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/13/2020. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Amy Jo Cioffi, 1202 Barbara Lane, Kinston, NC 28501.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Curran O'Brien on behalf of Dawn Stroud. (O'Brien, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Reissued as to Ronnie T. Ingram. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Reissued as to Dawn Stroud. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Ronnie T. Ingram, Dawn Stroud. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons filed by Amy Jo Cioffi served on Ronnie T. Ingram and Donna Stroud on 9/24/2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT to change name of Defendant Stroud against Ronnie T. Ingram, Dawn Stroud filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Ronnie T. Ingram, Donna Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Summons) Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ronnie T. Ingram, Donna Stroud (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number GRN002601), filed by Amy Jo Cioffi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less