This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 07:18:22 (UTC).

CINEUS v. STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 CINEUS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J FRANK and WILLIAM STAFFORD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00513

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM STAFFORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa Cineus

Defendants

CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JERRY GIRLEY

Attorney at THE GIRLEY LAW FIRM - ORLANDO FL

117 East Marks Street, Suite A

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorneys

BRIAN ALEXANDER WAHL

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT ETC - BIRMINGHAM AL

1819 5Th Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

JACOB BRANDON HANSON

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT ETC LLP - TAMPA FL

100 N Tampa Street, Ste 2200

Tampa, FL 33602

THOMAS R THOMPSON

Attorney at THOMPSON CRAWFORD & SMILEY - TALLAHASSEE FL

1330 Thomasville Rd [32303], Po Box 15158

Tallahassee, FL 32317

MALLORY R BENNETT

Attorney at THOMPSON CRAWFORD & SMILEY - TALLAHASSEE FL

1330 Thomasville Rd [32303], Po Box 15158

Tallahassee, FL 32317

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by THERESA CINEUS. (GIRLEY, JERRY) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#16

(#16) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by THERESA CINEUS. (GIRLEY, JERRY) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#15

(#15) REFERRAL AND ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint on or before December 21, 2020, Defendants shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of filing to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER re 12 Amended Complaint. The clerk of the court shall strike Plaintiff's first amended complaint (Doc. 12 ) from the electronic docket. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint and a motion to amend her complaint, she shall do so on or before 12/21/2020, and comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 12 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC. (HANSON, JACOB) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#18) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying without prejudice #7 , #8 Motions to Dismiss. Defendants shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of filing, December 14, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/18/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#7

(#18) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying without prejudice #7 , #8 Motions to Dismiss. Defendants shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of filing, December 14, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/18/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to JERRY GIRLEY, ESQ. on behalf of THERESA CINEUS. (jcw) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MALLORY R BENNETT on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (BENNETT, MALLORY) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF CONSENT OF REMOVAL by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (THOMPSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WAHL, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed re: #1 Notice of Removal. (cle) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings Answer due by 1/13/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying without prejudice #7 , #8 Motions to Dismiss. Defendants shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of filing, December 14, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/18/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Order, #17 Amended Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by THERESA CINEUS. (GIRLEY, JERRY) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by THERESA CINEUS. (GIRLEY, JERRY) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REFERRAL AND ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint on or before December 21, 2020, Defendants shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of filing to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re 12 Amended Complaint. The clerk of the court shall strike Plaintiff's first amended complaint (Doc. 12 ) from the electronic docket. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint and a motion to amend her complaint, she shall do so on or before 12/21/2020, and comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 12/9/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 12 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 12 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC. (HANSON, JACOB) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 12 First Amended Complaint. (jcw) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/20/2020). (THOMPSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CENTURION OF FLORIDA LLC. (WAHL, BRIAN) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to JERRY GIRLEY, ESQ. on behalf of THERESA CINEUS. (jcw) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed re: #1 Notice of Removal. (cle) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MALLORY R BENNETT on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (BENNETT, MALLORY) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CONSENT OF REMOVAL by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (THOMPSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WAHL, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney BRIAN WAHL - re: #1 Notice of Removal. In this District, party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Further, counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cle) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC from Second Judicial Circuit for Leon County, FL, case number 2020 CA 001243. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5734791.), filed by CENTURION OF FLORIDA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (WAHL, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Department of Corrections is a litigant