This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 07:25:55 (UTC).

Cinea v. Lee-Bell Transport Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Cinea filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lee-Bell Transport Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guillio Cinea

Defendants

Lee-Bell Transport Inc.

David Winters

Damario Bloodson

Carolina Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary D. Ludens

Attorney at Zebersky Payne Shaw Lewenz

110 Southeast 6Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Ankuda

Attorney at Ankuda, Stadler & Moeller

1621 Euclid Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44115

Paul R. Morway

Attorney at Ankuda, Stadler & Moeller

1621 Euclid Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44115

Joseph W. Pappalardo

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp - Cleveland

7Th Floor, 1215 Superior Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Affidavit Exh. A - Declaration of Guillio Cinea

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lee-Bell Transport Inc.. (Morway, Paul) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#12

(#12) Initial Disclosures filed by David Winters. (Morway, Paul) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#11

(#11) Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff' s Complaint (ECF No. 1) makes a conclusory statement that the amount in controversy is met, but such a statement does not satisfy the Court. Therefore, within seven days of this Order, Plaintiff must show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss this case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 03/03/2022. (D,Ju) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#10

(#10) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 30, 2022 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Carolina Casualty Insurance Company. (Pappalardo, Joseph) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#9

(#9) Return of Service by service on authorized person (corporation) executed upon Lee-Bell Transport Inc. on 2/9/2022, filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#8

(#8) Return of Service unexecuted upon Lee-Bell Transport Inc.. Service attempted by via listed registered agent on 1/29/2022 filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#7

(#7) Return of Service by service on registered agent (corporate) executed upon Carolina Casualty Insurance Company on 1/26/2022, filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) Return of Service by substitute service executed upon Damario Bloodson on 1/25/2022, filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

2 #2

Main Document

1 #5

Summons Summons - Carolina Casualty

1 #4

Summons Summons - Bloodson

1 #3

Summons Summons - Winters

1 #2

Summons Summons - Lee-Bell

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Response to Order to Show Cause (D.E. 11) filed by Guillio Cinea. Related document(s) #11 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exh. A - Declaration of Guillio Cinea) (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lee-Bell Transport Inc.. (Morway, Paul) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial Disclosures filed by David Winters. (Morway, Paul) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Lee-Bell Transport Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (G,M) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting #10 Defendant Caroline Casualty Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant is granted a 30-day extension of time, until 3/30/2022, to answer. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 03/03/2022.(D,Ju) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff' s Complaint (ECF No. 1) makes a conclusory statement that the amount in controversy is met, but such a statement does not satisfy the Court. Therefore, within seven days of this Order, Plaintiff must show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss this case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 03/03/2022. (D,Ju) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 30, 2022 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Carolina Casualty Insurance Company. (Pappalardo, Joseph) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service by service on authorized person (corporation) executed upon Lee-Bell Transport Inc. on 2/9/2022, filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service unexecuted upon Lee-Bell Transport Inc.. Service attempted by via listed registered agent on 1/29/2022 filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service by service on registered agent (corporate) executed upon Carolina Casualty Insurance Company on 1/26/2022, filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service by substitute service executed upon Damario Bloodson on 1/25/2022, filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by substitute service executed upon David Winters on 1/25/2022, filed on behalf of Guillio Cinea Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Ankuda and Paul R. Morway filed by on behalf of Damario Bloodson, Lee-Bell Transport Inc., David Winters. (Ankuda, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Damario Bloodson, Lee-Bell Transport Inc., David Winters. (Ankuda, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Damario Bloodson, Carolina Casualty Insurance Company by serving registered agent, Ann Collins, Lee-Bell Transport Inc. by serving registered agent, Damario W. Bloodson, and David Winters. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ju) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (D,Ju) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (D,Ju) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11222522. Filed by Guillio Cinea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Lee-Bell, #3 Summons - Winters, #4 Summons - Bloodson, #5 Summons - Carolina Casualty) (Ludens, Zachary) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAROLINA CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Robert Morway

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Ankuda

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph W. Pappalardo