3:23-CV-00839
02/24/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Product Liability
Trina L Thompson
Cindy Greenwood
Medical Device Business Services Inc.
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc.
Thomas Schmalzried
1-25 Does
Depuy Inc
Depuy International Limited
Johnson and Johnson
Johnson and Johnson Services Inc
Johnson and Johnson International
Ian James Barlow
Mark John Tamblyn
Stuart C. Talley
William A. Kershaw
Alexander Gerard Calfo
Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Kelley S. Olah
(#44) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to District Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on March 15, 2023. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
(#42) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Depuy Inc, Depuy International Limited, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc, Medical Device Business Services Inc... (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
(#41) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/28/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
(#40) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cindy Greenwood.. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/13/2023) (Entered: 03/13/2023)
(#39) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
(#38) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
*Restricted*
(#37) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:11-cv-09984. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/24/2023)
(#8) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings #7 by Judge John A Kronstadt. It is hereby ORDERED that: All proceedings in this action are hereby stayed, pending a decision bythe Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on whether this case should be transferred to In re DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL Docket No. 2244. (lom) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Stay Proceedings
(#8) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings #7 by Judge John A Kronstadt. It is hereby ORDERED that: All proceedings in this action are hereby stayed, pending a decision bythe Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on whether this case should be transferred to In re DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL Docket No. 2244. (lom) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thomas Schmalzried answer now due 1/7/2012, filed by Defendant Thomas Schmalzried.(Walsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
(#5) NOTICE filed by Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL (Olah, Kelley) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, re Certificate of Service #3 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Certification of Interested Parties #2 served on 12/1/11. (esa) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, re Certificate of Service #3 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Certification of Interested Parties #2 served on 12/1/11. (esa) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, re Certificate of Service #3 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Certification of Interested Parties #2 served on 12/1/11. (esa) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
Civil Cover Sheet
(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, re Certificate of Service #3 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Certification of Interested Parties #2 served on 12/1/11. (esa) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
Docket(#46) CLERK'S NOTICE - RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2023 is re-set for 6/29/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 3/17/2023) (Entered: 03/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#45) CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#44) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to District Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on March 15, 2023. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2023) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#43) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#42) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Depuy Inc, Depuy International Limited, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc, Medical Device Business Services Inc... (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#41) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/28/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#40) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cindy Greenwood.. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/13/2023) (Entered: 03/13/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#39) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#38) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#37) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:11-cv-09984. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/24/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV11-02441 GW (JCx). Case transferred from Judge John A Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV11-09984 GW (JCx).Signed by Judge George H Wu (at) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A Kronstadt: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of this litigation in federal court. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this case, as called for in Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all parties or their counsel are ordered to become familiar with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Central District of California, and this Courts standing orders. (See order for further details). (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings #7 by Judge John A Kronstadt. It is hereby ORDERED that: All proceedings in this action are hereby stayed, pending a decision bythe Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on whether this case should be transferred to In re DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL Docket No. 2244. (lom) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Stay Proceedings)(Calfo, Alexander) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thomas Schmalzried answer now due 1/7/2012, filed by Defendant Thomas Schmalzried.(Walsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE filed by Defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL (Olah, Kelley) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, re Certificate of Service #3 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Certification of Interested Parties #2 served on 12/1/11. (esa) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on 12/1/11. (esa) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CERTIFICATION OF INTERSTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, identifying Other Affiliate Johnson and Johnson International, Other Affiliate Johnson and Johnson for DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. (esa) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number BC472274 with CONFORMED copies of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge John A Kronstadt, discovery to Magistrate Judge Fernando M Olguin; (Filing fee $ 350 PAID ); filed by defendant DePuy Orthopaedics Inc.(esa) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). (Entered: 12/02/2011)
[-] Read Less