This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2019 at 07:49:25 (UTC).

Cincinnati Life Insurance Company v. Banks Holdings Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Cincinnati Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Banks Holdings Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02949

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cincinnati Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Banks Holding Company

Kem W Swarts

Daina H Banks

Estate of Brian S. Banks

Kem W. Swarts

Banks Holdings Company

Daina H. Banks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Clark Collier

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP-Denver

1225 17Th Street, Suite 2750

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. Daina H. Banks waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; Estate of Brian S. Banks waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. Banks Holdings Company waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#12

(#12) PAYMENT RECEIVED in the amount of $ 506,885.38; Receipt Number COX092748; Initial Payment. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#11

(#11) AMENDED ORDER re: #2 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by The Vanguard Group Inc., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2019. (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Amendment of Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2019.(tsher, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #7 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2019. Consent Form due by 12/5/2019. Status Conference set for 12/19/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Deposit Funds, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2019.(tsher, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

6 #3

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

6 #2

Summons

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vangaurd Group Inc. for Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

1 #15

Summons Kem W. Swarts

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit K - CSS Change of Reg. Agent

1 #7

Exhibit G - Life Inspection Rpt

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. Daina H. Banks waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; Estate of Brian S. Banks waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. Banks Holdings Company waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PAYMENT RECEIVED in the amount of $ 506,885.38; Receipt Number COX092748; Initial Payment. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED ORDER re: #2 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by The Vanguard Group Inc., by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2019. (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Amendment of Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2019.(tsher, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #7 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2019. Consent Form due by 12/5/2019. Status Conference set for 12/19/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Deposit Funds, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2019.(tsher, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • (#4) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Attorney Jessica Clark Collier has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) Modified on 10/24/2019 (trvo, ). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vangaurd Group Inc. for Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader against Daina H Banks, Banks Holding Company, Estate of Brian S. Banks, Kem W Swarts (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6948001)Attorney Jessica Clark Collier added to party Cincinnati Life Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CSS Change of Address, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Application, #3 Exhibit C - Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Ltrs Testamentary, #5 Exhibit E - Order Admitting Will, #6 Exhibit F - Swarts Claimant Stmt, #7 Exhibit G - Life Inspection Rpt, #8 Exhibit H - Policy, #9 Exhibit I - 8.5.19 Corresp, #10 Exhibit J - Banks Claimant Stmt, #11 Exhibit K - CSS Change of Reg. Agent, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons Banks Holding Company, #14 Summons Daina H. Banks, #15 Summons Kem W. Swarts)(Collier, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Clark Collier