This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 08:04:55 (UTC).

Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Cincinnati Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Shirley Padmore Mensah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00358

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shirley Padmore Mensah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cincinnati Insurance Company

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David P. Bub

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Brandon B. Copeland

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey John Woltjen, I

Attorney at SMITH JADIN PLLC

7900 Xerxes Ave. S., Suite 2020

Bloomington, MN 55431

Alexander M. Jadin

Attorney at SMITH JADIN PLLC

7900 Xerxes Ave. S., Suite 2020

Bloomington, MN 55431

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. . (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY: by Defendant Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc. (Jadin, Alexander) Modified on 4/17/2020 (AAT). (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 5/13/2020. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/13/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/20/2020 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/14/20. (EAB) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, For Declaratory Judgment, COUNTERCLAIM And Breach Of Contract against plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company by Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc..(Woltjen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland for Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Bub for Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company Cincinnati Insurance Company waiver signed on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #4

Waiver of Service

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7797404, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Waiver of Service)(Bub, David) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Text ORDER: Re #10 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY by Defendant Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED, Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 5/1/20. (EAB) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. . (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY: by Defendant Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc. (Jadin, Alexander) Modified on 4/17/2020 (AAT). (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 5/13/2020. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/13/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/20/2020 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/14/20. (EAB) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketJudge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah. (CSAW) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, For Declaratory Judgment, COUNTERCLAIM And Breach Of Contract against plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company by Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc..(Woltjen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland for Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Bub for Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company Cincinnati Insurance Company waiver signed on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Saint Louis Produce Markets, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7797404, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Waiver of Service)(Bub, David) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander M. Jadin