This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2020 at 12:12:29 (UTC).

Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 Cincinnati Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jacob Rieger Co , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cincinnati Insurance Company

Defendant

Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P. Bub

Attorney at Brown & James, PC-St.Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Kelsey Leigh McLean

Attorney at Brown & James, PC-St.Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (McLean, Kelsey) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC filed by Kelsey Leigh McLean on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McLean, Kelsey) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC. (Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC filed by David P. Bub on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6767034. Service due by 6/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bub, David) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacob Rieger & Co., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey Leigh McLean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Bub