This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2019 at 07:32:13 (UTC).

CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY v. FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-19251

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1-5

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5

FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDMUND P. PERRY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT A. STUTMAN, P.C.

20 East Taunton Road, Suite 403

Berlin, NJ 08029

Defendant Attorney

GEORGE W. WRIGHT

Attorney at GEORGE W. WRIGHT & ASSOCIATES, LLC

505 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing complaint counts I and III only without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/29/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#7

(#7) Order Initial Conference set for 1/7/2019 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/4/19. (if, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC..(WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. from NJ Superior Court, Middlesex County, Law Division, case number MID-L-6543-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10055781), filed by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. identifying Fedex Freight Corporation and FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Complaint Counts I and III only by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PERRY, EDMUND) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Initial Conference set for 1/7/2019 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/4/19. (if, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC..(WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing complaint counts I and III only without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/29/2019. (jdb) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Complaint Counts I and III only by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PERRY, EDMUND) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -EDMUND PERRY appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (abr) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. identifying Fedex Freight Corporation and FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC. from NJ Superior Court, Middlesex County, Law Division, case number MID-L-6543-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10055781), filed by FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WRIGHT, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less